This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2021 at 19:39:06 (UTC).

CINMARK COMPANY L P VS INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS INC E

Case Summary

On 12/13/2013 CINMARK COMPANY L P filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS INC E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT H. O'BRIEN and MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0555

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT H. O'BRIEN

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CINMARK COMPANY L.P.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-25

GUMPERTZ MARCIA

ICELAND JANIS

INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS INC.

KENDRICK MARGARET

WHINFREY THOMAS

WHITMAN SANDRA

WOLEN ALAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MUSICK PEELER & GARRETT LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LESLIE MICHAEL ESQ.

SELMAN & BREITMAN LLP

SINCLAIR MURRAY M.

CALDWELL LESLIE & PROCTOR PC

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

12/13/2013: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

12/13/2013: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

DECLARATION OF ADAM D. WIEDER REGARDING EX PARTE NOTICE OF CINMARK COMPANY, LP.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO AVI?ACII ORDER

12/18/2013: DECLARATION OF ADAM D. WIEDER REGARDING EX PARTE NOTICE OF CINMARK COMPANY, LP.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO AVI?ACII ORDER

DKCLARATION 01? THOMAS WHJNI?REY IN SUPPORT OF 1)EFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINFERS? OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFI CINMARK COMPANY

12/18/2013: DKCLARATION 01? THOMAS WHJNI?REY IN SUPPORT OF 1)EFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINFERS? OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFI CINMARK COMPANY

OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK COMPANY

12/18/2013: OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK COMPANY

Minute Order -

12/18/2013: Minute Order -

APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER, ETC. (AFTACHMENT

12/18/2013: APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER, ETC. (AFTACHMENT

OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS, INC. TO DECLARATION OF JONATHAN ROHRER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND/OR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK

12/31/2013: OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS, INC. TO DECLARATION OF JONATHAN ROHRER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND/OR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK

OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS, INC. TO DECLARATION OF BARRY GROVEMAN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND/OR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK C

12/31/2013: OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS, INC. TO DECLARATION OF BARRY GROVEMAN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND/OR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK C

PROOF OF SERVICE RE DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS? OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT OF ATTACHMENT AND/OR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK COMPANY

12/31/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE RE DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS? OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT OF ATTACHMENT AND/OR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK COMPANY

OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS, INC. TO DECLARATION OF MARK WOLFSON IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND/OR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK COM

12/31/2013: OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS, INC. TO DECLARATION OF MARK WOLFSON IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND/OR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK COM

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

12/31/2013: NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS, INC. TO DECLARATION OF JONATHON WOLFSON IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND/OR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK

12/31/2013: OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS, INC. TO DECLARATION OF JONATHON WOLFSON IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND/OR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK

OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS, INC. TO DECLARATION OF KIM WOLFSON ITS SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND/OR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK COM

12/31/2013: OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS, INC. TO DECLARATION OF KIM WOLFSON ITS SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND/OR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK COM

OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS, INC. TO DECLARATION OF TONY LAURITA IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND/OR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK COM

12/31/2013: OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS, INC. TO DECLARATION OF TONY LAURITA IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND/OR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK COM

RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEER TO DECLARATION OF JONATHON WOLFSON IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFF?S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

1/3/2014: RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEER TO DECLARATION OF JONATHON WOLFSON IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFF?S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEER TO DECLARATION OF MARK WOLFSON IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFF?S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

1/3/2014: RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEER TO DECLARATION OF MARK WOLFSON IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFF?S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

1/3/2014: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

157 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Status Conference (Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Industrial Electronic Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DocketJOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK COMPANY AND DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Status Conference (Status Conference; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketJOINT STATUS REPORT OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK COMPANY AND DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
303 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Industrial Electronic Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketOpposition Document; Filed by Industrial Electronic Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER, ETC. (AFTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketDKCLARATION 01 THOMAS WHJNIREY IN SUPPORT OF 1)EFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINFERS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFI CINMARK COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketOPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF CINMARK COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ADAM D. WIEDER REGARDING EX PARTE NOTICE OF CINMARK COMPANY, LP.S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO AVIACII ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cinmark Company, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONIC ENGINEERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CINMARK COMPANY LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LESLIE MICHAEL ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SINCLAIR MURRAY M.