This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/19/2020 at 07:15:43 (UTC).

CIENAGA WEST INC VS JAVA EQUITIES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/16/2010 CIENAGA WEST INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAVA EQUITIES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5649

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CIENAGA WEST INC.

CLEANMORE MAINTENANCE COMPANY

Defendants

12344 BURBANK LLC

15425 VANOWEN LLC

18400 COLLINS LLC

18540 COLLINS LLC

6345 KESTER LLC

DOES 1-25

JAVA EQUITIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARSON CHARLES L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/21/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/21/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/21/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE

3/30/2011: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

4/29/2011: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

COMPUTATION OF INTEREST

7/8/2011: COMPUTATION OF INTEREST

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

7/8/2011: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

STATEMENT OF THE CASE

7/8/2011: STATEMENT OF THE CASE

JUDGMENT BY COURT

7/8/2011: JUDGMENT BY COURT

RETURN ON ATTACHMENT / EXECUTION

11/26/2012: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT / EXECUTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2012
  • DocketRETURN ON ATTACHMENT / EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 35; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 35; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF THE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Cienaga West, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Cienaga West, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Cienaga West, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cienaga West, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; COMMON COUNTS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 18400 COLLINS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where 18540 COLLINS ST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LARSON CHARLES L.