This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2020 at 23:24:27 (UTC).

CIENAGA WEST INC VS BEYOND SHELTER INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/20/2011 CIENAGA WEST INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BEYOND SHELTER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3900

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CIENAGA WEST INC.

CLEANMORE MAINTENANCE COMPANY

FOUNDATION FLOORING INC.

Defendants

B S BROADWAY VILLAGE II L.P.

BEYOND SHELTER HOUSING DEVELOPMENT CORPO-

BEYOND SHELTER INC.

CORONADO PLACE ASSOCIATES L.P.

DOES 1-50

ELLAS ZOE

IMPERIAL HIGHWAY APARTMENTS L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARSON CHARLES L. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

GRAHAM CURTIS A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; COMMON COUNTS

6/20/2011: COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; COMMON COUNTS

SUMMONS -

6/21/2011: SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/7/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/7/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/7/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/7/2011: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/7/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

9/21/2011: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

11/22/2011: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

11/22/2011: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/5/2011: NOTICE OF HEARING

Minute Order -

1/4/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF MOTION NI) MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULTS AND/OR TO QUASH SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ETC

1/6/2012: NOTICE OF MOTION NI) MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULTS AND/OR TO QUASH SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ETC

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

1/27/2012: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order -

1/30/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING

2/7/2012: NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order -

3/14/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MARCH 3, 2017 HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

4/4/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MARCH 3, 2017 HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MARCH 3, 2017 HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 48; Court Order (Court Order; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cienaga West, Inc. (Plaintiff); Cleanmore Maintenance Company (Legacy Party); Foundation Flooring, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 48; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 48; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC not held & continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Cienaga West, Inc. (Plaintiff); Cleanmore Maintenance Company (Legacy Party); Foundation Flooring, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Cienaga West, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; COMMON COUNTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cienaga West, Inc. (Plaintiff); Foundation Flooring, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMPERIAL HIGHWAY APARTMENTS LP is a litigant

Latest cases where B S BROADWAY VILLAGE LP is a litigant

Latest cases where BEYOND SHELTER HOUSING DEVELOPMENT CORPO- is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAHAM CURTIS A. ESQ.