This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 21:50:35 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER ROMERO ET AL VS BEVERLY SANCHEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 CHRISTOPHER ROMERO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEVERLY SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE, AMY D. HOGUE and MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3524

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROMERO CHRISTOPHER

Defendants and Respondents

JARVIS DAVID CLIFFORD

JERVIS DONALD LEROY

JARVIS PINKY

VASQUEZ XIOMARA

ZAKARIA YEHIA

SANCHEZ BEVERLY

DOES 1 THROUGH 5

JARVIS DONALD L.

JERVIS PINKEY

MGTD PROPERTIES LP

CROWNVIC ONE LLC

MARTINEZ ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

SAFARIAN AROUTUN HARRY

LEE CHRISTINE S.

 

Court Documents

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES;AND ETC.

5/29/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES;AND ETC.

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Declaration

10/26/2018: Declaration

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

10/26/2018: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Unknown

11/30/2018: Unknown

Unknown

12/6/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

1/11/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

1/11/2019: Unknown

Opposition

4/4/2019: Opposition

Case Management Statement

4/4/2019: Case Management Statement

Opposition

4/5/2019: Opposition

Minute Order

5/14/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

5/16/2019: Notice of Ruling

Other -

5/24/2019: Other -

COMPLAINT FO DAMAGES 1. COMPLAINT BY TENANTS AGAINST LANDLORD FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES LAND PROPERTY DAMAGEJBASED ON NEGLIGENCE [CIV. CODE 1714(A), 3333]; AND ETC

12/14/2016: COMPLAINT FO DAMAGES 1. COMPLAINT BY TENANTS AGAINST LANDLORD FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES LAND PROPERTY DAMAGEJBASED ON NEGLIGENCE [CIV. CODE 1714(A), 3333]; AND ETC

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • summons on second amended complaint; Filed by Christopher Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Second Amended Complaint; Filed by Christopher Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Xiomara Vasquez (Defendant); Yehia Zakaria (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Beverly Sanchez (Defendant); Xiomara Vasquez (Defendant); Yehia Zakaria (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Order (re: hearing of 5/14/19); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Christopher Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES;AND ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Christopher Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Christopher Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • COMPLAINT FO DAMAGES 1. COMPLAINT BY TENANTS AGAINST LANDLORD FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES LAND PROPERTY DAMAGEJBASED ON NEGLIGENCE [CIV. CODE 1714(A), 3333]; AND ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Christopher Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC643524    Hearing Date: January 07, 2020    Dept: SEC

ROMERO v. SANCHEZ, et al.

CASE NO.: BC643524

HEARING: 1/7/19

JUDGE: OLIVIA ROSALES

#6

TENTATIVE ORDER

I. Defendant Sanchez’s demurrer is SUSTAINED without leave to amend.

II. Defendants Sanchez, Vasquez, and Zakaria’s motion to strike is DENIED.

Moving parties to give NOTICE.

I. Demurrer

Defendant Sanchez demurs to the 1st – 2nd causes of action on the grounds that they fail to state facts sufficient to constitute causes of action and are uncertain.

UNCERTAINTY

Demurrer on grounds of uncertainty will not be sustained unless the complaint is so bad that the defendant cannot reasonably respond. (Koury v. Maly’s of California (1993) 14 Cal.App.4th 612, 616.)

On 5/14/19, this court found that the First Amended Complaint was uncertain as to Beverly Sanchez because the FAC alleged no wrongdoing by Sanchez. Plaintiff was given an opportunity to amend, but failed to cure the prior defects. Accordingly, demurrer is SUSTAINED without leave to amend.

2ND CAUSE OF ACTION

RETROACTIVE RENT ABATEMENT is not a valid cause of action. It appears that Plaintiff is asserting the remedy of rent abatement for the hazardous and unhealthy conditions that he was subjected to.

The Court construes the 2nd cause of action as a prayer for relief. The Clerk is ordered to strike the “2nd cause of action” by interlineation.

II. Motion to Strike

Defendants Sanchez, Vasquez, and Zakaria move to strike allegations added to the SAC without leave of court.

Although this court did not grant Plaintiff leave to add the new allegations, the court declines to strike the allegations because they relate to Plaintiff’s negligence and habitability claims.

Motion is DENIED.