Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/25/2016 at 13:24:23 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER PETROVIC VS DC CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOP. ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2008 CHRISTOPHER PETROVIC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DC CONSTRUCTION DEVELOP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANDREW C. KAUFFMAN, RAMONA G. SEE and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8610

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANDREW C. KAUFFMAN

RAMONA G. SEE

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETROVIC JENNIFER

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

DC CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC.

Cross Defendants

CARLOS FERNANDEZ

FLOORZ INC.

G&M PLASTERING INC.

O'ROURKE CONSTRUCTION INC.

IRON ART

DECKRITE WATERPROOFING COMPANY INC.

ACTION ROOFING INC.

DAVID CHOATE CONSTRUCTION INC.

CUSTOM HEATING AND AIR

CREATIVE TOUCH CABINETRY BY HIS LIFE

DECOCAL INC.

CHAMBERS ENTERPRISES

PAUL CHANCE

FRANK C. MONS

TRIPLE T. CONSTRUCTION

RAMIRO SANTOS

SHAWN RUSSELL

FAMA CUSTOM TILE CO

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOWARD LOVEDER STRICKROTH & PARKER LLP

RETZ KIRK J. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HOSP GILBERT BERGSTEN & HOUGH A LAW

Cross Defendant Attorneys

KRING & CHUNG LLP LAW OFFICES

GATES O'DOHERTY GONTER & GUY

LIEB & LIEB

LAW OFFICE OF HOWARD E. HAMANN P.C.

SKANE WILCOX LLP

MURTAUGH MEYER NELSON & TREGLIA LLP

LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT A. WALKER

MURPHY PEARSON BRADLEY & FEENEY

WATERS MCCLUSKEY & BOEHLE

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

CHRISTOPHER P. RUIZ

Other Attorneys

WANG WILLIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2012
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S ( DC CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT,INC ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Notice (NOTICT TO BOOKKEEPER: THE INITIAL JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00,DEPOSITED 3/11/10,RECEIPT #SBB271571004, IS ORDERED TRANSF. FROM TRUST TO THE STATE TRIAL FUND ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for X-Deft/X-Comp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2011
  • Notice (RE: ENTRY OF ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS- COMPLAINT OF DC CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC. AS TO CROSS-DEFT. CUSTOM HEATING AND AIR ONLY FOR A WAIVER OF COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS-COMPLNT OF DC CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC FILED ON 2/11/10 AS TO CROSS-DEFT. ACTION ROOFING, INC. ONLY FOR A WAIVER OF COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2011
  • Order (ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AS TO CUSTOM HEATING & AIR SIGNED AND FILED. ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2011
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • Partial Dismissal (RE: X-COMPL FILED 02/11/10 ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
156 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2009
  • Points and Authorities (memorandum of points and authorities in reply to plaintiff' opposition to defendant's motion to strike portions of plaintiff's complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • Opposition (defendant's MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • Motion to Strike (DEFT., DC CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOP- MENT, INC.,'S: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • Demurrer (DEFENDANT, DC CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC.,'S: NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVE DC CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMEN ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2008
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2008
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G&M PLASTERING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where O'ROURKE CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where ACTION ROOFINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DECKRITE WATERPROOFING COMPANY INC. is a litigant