This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 12:28:43 (UTC).

CHRISTINE OLIVIA WARE VS SUNTREK INDUSTRIES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2016 CHRISTINE OLIVIA WARE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUNTREK INDUSTRIES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1368

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WARE CHRISTINE OLIVIA

Defendants and Respondents

SUNTREK INDUSTRIES INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

HEINE ETHAN GARRETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GOLDSZER RONALD I. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

FENG IRVING ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF RONALD I. GOLDSZER REGARDING STATUS OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT; REQUEST TO VACATE FSC AND TRIAL DATE; REQUEST FOR OSC RE ANSWER/DEFAULT AND/OR CMC

5/2/2018: DECLARATION OF RONALD I. GOLDSZER REGARDING STATUS OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT; REQUEST TO VACATE FSC AND TRIAL DATE; REQUEST FOR OSC RE ANSWER/DEFAULT AND/OR CMC

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

5/24/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

Unknown

5/24/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

7/26/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

1/8/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

1/8/2019: Minute Order

Motion to Compel

2/1/2019: Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

2/1/2019: Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

2/1/2019: Motion to Compel

Motion re:

3/1/2019: Motion re:

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

3/1/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order

4/3/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/3/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/4/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

4/12/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

5/23/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

5/24/2019: Notice of Ruling

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Suntrek Industries, Inc. (Defendant); Ethan Garrett Heine (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Responses of Plaintiff Christine Olivia Ware to Requests for Production of Documents) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Responses of Plaintiff Christine Olivia Ware to Form Interrogatories) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Responses of Plaintiff Christine Olivia Ware to Special Interrogatories) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Responses of Plaintiff Christine ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Christine Olivia Ware (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Responses of Plaintiff Christine Olivia Ware to Special Interrogatories) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Responses of Plaintiff Christine Olivia Ware to Requests for Production of Documents) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-05-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DECLARATION OF RONALD I. GOLDSZER REGARDING STATUS OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT; REQUEST TO VACATE FSC AND TRIAL DATE; REQUEST FOR OSC RE ANSWER/DEFAULT AND/OR CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Christine Olivia Ware (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Christine Olivia Ware (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Christine Olivia Ware (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC641368    Hearing Date: December 06, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

christine olivia Ware,

Plaintiff,

v.

Suntrek Industries, inc., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC641368

Hearing Date: October 23, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

defendantS’ motion for terminating sanctions

Defendants Ethan Garrett Heinke and Suntrek Industries (“Defendants”) move for terminating sanctions against Plaintiff Christine Olivia Ware (“Plaintiff”). The Court has discretion to impose terminating sanction when a party willfully disobeys a discovery order. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2023.010, subd. (g), 2030.290, subd. (c).) The Court may impose a terminating sanction by dismissing the party’s action. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.030, subd. (d).)

In its order of May 23, 2019, the Court ordered Plaintiff to respond to Defendants’ form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and request for production of documents within 30 days of notice of the order. Defendants served Plaintiffs with notice via regular mail on May 24, 2019, but the notice was sent to Ronald I. Goldszer, Esq. This notice was not sufficient as the Court granted Mr. Goldszer’s motion to be relieved on April 3, 2019, and he was relieved when he provided notice of the Court’s order on April 10, 2019.

The Court continues this motion to December 6, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. Assuming Defendants serve the Court’s order of May 23, 2019 upon Plaintiff and file proof of service with the Court, if Plaintiff does not oppose the motion or otherwise demonstrate compliance with the Court’s order of May 23, 2019, the Court’s tentative order is to grant this motion. Any party who does not appear at the hearing shall waive their right to be heard and shall submit to any decision of the Court on this motion.

Conclusion and Order

Defendants’ motion for terminating sanctions is continued to December 6, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. The Court’s tentative decision is to grant the motion and dismiss this case. Defendants shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 6, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court