This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2021 at 15:12:05 (UTC).

CHRISTINE LONDON, LTD VS TERRE JACOBS

Case Summary

On 09/10/2015 CHRISTINE LONDON, LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TERRE JACOBS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4727

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTINE LONDON LTD

Defendant

JACOBS TERRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NAGLER & ASSOCIATES

AIDIKOFF JEFF

Defendant Attorney

WASSERMAN LAW GROUP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by Christine London, LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (W/PREJUDICE COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (W/PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY TERRE JACOBS ON JANUARY 4, 2016 **THIS DISMISSAL IS THE LAST, CASE IS DISMISSED**); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by Terre Jacobs (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Former Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Christine London, LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Terre Jacobs (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Christine London, LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Terre Jacobs (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Christine London, LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Christine London, LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHRISTINE LONDON LTD. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant