Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2019 at 10:30:15 (UTC).

CHRISTINA ANDREASSEN VS JUAN CARLOS ISLASGONZALEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/03/2015 CHRISTINA ANDREASSEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JUAN CARLOS ISLASGONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BENNY C. OSORIO and HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3952

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BENNY C. OSORIO

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ANDREASSEN CHRISTINA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 - 20

ISLAS JUAN CARLOS

ISLASGONZALEZ JUAN CARLOS

VENICE MOVING & STORAGE INC.

WALTER'S TRANSFER MOVING AND STORAGE

DOES 1-20

VENICE MOVING AND STORAGE INC DBA WALTERS

JUAN CARLOS ISLASGONZALEZ AKA JUAN CARLOS

CARLOS JUAN ISLASGONZALEZ AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ERLBAUM BRENNA E.

ERLBAUM BRENNA

DORDICK GARY ALAN

ERLBAUM BRENA E.

HEIT BRIAN M.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WATERKOTTE GRANT D.

WATERKOTTE GRANT D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

6/3/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT 1) SEXUAL BATTERY; ETC

6/3/2015: COMPLAINT 1) SEXUAL BATTERY; ETC

DEFENDANT JUAN CARLOS ISLAS' ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT

7/6/2015: DEFENDANT JUAN CARLOS ISLAS' ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/8/2015: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/8/2015: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/8/2015: DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1) SEXUAL BATTERY, ETC

8/17/2015: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1) SEXUAL BATTERY, ETC

DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC.'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/21/2015: DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC.'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPELL PRODUCTION OF JUAN CARLOS ISLAS'S EMPLOYEE PERSONEL FILE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF BRENNA ERLBAUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF; PROPOSED OR

9/29/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPELL PRODUCTION OF JUAN CARLOS ISLAS'S EMPLOYEE PERSONEL FILE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF BRENNA ERLBAUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF; PROPOSED OR

DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

11/13/2015: DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF IWEKE OPOS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMAR JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

11/13/2015: DECLARATION OF IWEKE OPOS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMAR JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF ANDREW I. CHUNG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC. DBA WALTER?S TRANSFER MOVING AND STORAGE?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

11/13/2015: DECLARATION OF ANDREW I. CHUNG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC. DBA WALTER?S TRANSFER MOVING AND STORAGE?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC. DBA WALTER'S TRANSFER MOVING AND STORAGE'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

11/13/2015: DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC. DBA WALTER'S TRANSFER MOVING AND STORAGE'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES EN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN TUE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY AJUDICATION OF ISSUES

11/13/2015: DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES EN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN TUE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY AJUDICATION OF ISSUES

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE AND TESTIMONY OF JUAN CARLOS ISLAS; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF BRENNA E. ERLBAUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF; EXHIBIT

12/15/2015: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE AND TESTIMONY OF JUAN CARLOS ISLAS; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF BRENNA E. ERLBAUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF; EXHIBIT

DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC. DBA WALTER'S TRANSFER MOVING AND STORAGE'S AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

1/11/2016: DEFENDANT VENICE MOVING & STORAGE, INC. DBA WALTER'S TRANSFER MOVING AND STORAGE'S AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT

1/19/2016: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 97; (OSC RE Dismissal; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • (Request-Dismissal); Filed by CHRISTINA ANDREASSEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department A; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department A; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Final Status Conference (Conference-Final Status; Not held-Case settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by CHRISTINA ANDREASSEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by VENICE MOVING AND STORAGE INC DBA WALTERS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by VENICE MOVING AND STORAGE INC DBA WALTERS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by VENICE MOVING AND STORAGE INC DBA WALTERS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2015
  • DEFENDANT JUAN CARLOS ISLAS' ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Juan Carlos Islas (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by CHRISTINA ANDREASSEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • COMPLAINT 1) SEXUAL BATTERY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • Summons-Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by CHRISTINA ANDREASSEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENICE MOVING AND STORAGE INC. DBA WALTERS TRANSFER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATERKOTTE GRANT D. ESQ.