Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 08:48:07 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN VIRAMONTES VS. ATT&T CORP

Case Summary

On 01/05/2012 CHRISTIAN VIRAMONTES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ATT T CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARGARET M. BERNAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0267

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARGARET M. BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIRAMONTES CHRISTIAN

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AT&T CORP

CITY OF PICO RIVERA

COBO DIEGO

EL NORA STREET TRUST

SOUTHERN CAL EDISON CO

TRUSTEE FOR EL NORA ST TRUST

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

VERIZON CALIFORNIA INC.

PICO RIVERA CITY OF

AT & T

AT&T CORP (ERRONEOUSLY SUED)

AT&T CORP ERRONEOUSLY SUED

TIME WARNER NY CABLE LLC -FOE 1/DOE 2

EL NORA ST TRUST

TIME WARNER CABLE INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED)

GTE CALIFORNIA INC. (ERRON. SUED)

GTE CALIFORNIA INC. ERRON. SUED

TIME WARNER CABLE INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANECKE LAW GROUP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

EVEN RANDOLPH M. & ASSOCIATES

SEKI NISHIMURA & WATASE LLP

LEVINE STEVEN D. LAW OFFICES OF

WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP

JONES ANDREW M.

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2013
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to this date, o/c settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to this date, o/c settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Advanced to this date, o/c settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by WILSON,ELSER,MOSKOWITZ,EDELMAN & DICKER (Attorney); TIME WARNER NY CABLE, LLC -FOE 1/DOE 2 (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by TIME WARNER NY CABLE, LLC -FOE 1/DOE 2 (Legacy Party); TIME WARNER CABLE INC. (erroneously sued) (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; X-C FILED BY TIME WARNER NY CABLE LLC ON 09/14/12 ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE: DISMISSAL) - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • DocketOrd of Disml for Settled Case (IN MINUTE ORDER OF 1/29/13; ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
170 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON CO. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY (Legacy Party); AT & T (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY (Legacy Party); AT & T (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • DocketDeft's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • DocketDeft's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer; Filed by PICO RIVERA, CITY OF (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PICO RIVERA CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF PICO RIVERA is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CAL EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where TIME WARNER NY CABLE LLC is a litigant