This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 14:59:18 (UTC).

CHRISTER ANDERSSON VS CITY OF LONG BEACH, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/07/2009 CHRISTER ANDERSSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LONG BEACH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICK T. MADDEN and JOSEPH E. DILORETO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2782

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PATRICK T. MADDEN

JOSEPH E. DILORETO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHRISTER ANDERSSON

ANDERSSON CHRISTER

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

EXCELSIOR ELEVATOR CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

ROES 1 TO 25

CENTRAL PARKING SYSTEM INC.

CITY OF LONG BEACH

INTERNATIONAL PARKING DESIGN INC. (ROE2)

INTERNATL PARKING DESIGN INC. (MOE 2)

GLOBAL ELEVATORS (ROE 1)

GLOBAL ELEVATORS (MOE 1)

GLOBAL ELEVATORS MOE 1

INTERNATL PARKING DESIGN INC. MOE 2

GLOBAL ELEVATORS ROE 1

INTERNATIONAL PARKING DESIGN INC. ROE2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H. ANDREW WASMUND ESQ

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBERT E. SHANNON

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND LLP

BEATTY & MYERS LLP

WAYNE & ASSOCIATES

SHANNON ROBERT E.

Cross Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JAMES T. DUFF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2011
  • at 08:30 AM in Department H; (OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg.; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by CHRISTER ANDERSSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by EXCELSIOR ELEVATOR CORPORATION (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; (Dismissal or Judgment to be filed; Matter is continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • Notice; Filed by CENTRAL PARKING SYSTEM INC. (Legacy Party); CITY OF LONG BEACH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2010
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by CENTRAL PARKING SYSTEM INC. (Legacy Party); CITY OF LONG BEACH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • at 08:30 AM in Department H; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by EXCELSIOR ELEVATOR CORPORATION (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • Exhibit List; Filed by EXCELSIOR ELEVATOR CORPORATION (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2009
  • Notice; Filed by CENTRAL PARKING SYSTEM INC. (Legacy Party); CITY OF LONG BEACH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • Answer; Filed by CITY OF LONG BEACH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by CENTRAL PARKING SYSTEM INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • Answer; Filed by CENTRAL PARKING SYSTEM INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by EXCELSIOR ELEVATOR CORPORATION (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by CHRISTER ANDERSSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by CHRISTER ANDERSSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by CHRISTER ANDERSSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2009
  • Summons; Filed by CHRISTER ANDERSSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2009
  • Complaint; Filed by CHRISTER ANDERSSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERNATIONAL PARKIN DESIGN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRAL PARKING SYSTEM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LONG BEACH is a litigant