This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 22:49:41 (UTC).

CHRIS CURRY VS ACADEMY POINTE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/20/2016 CHRIS CURRY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ACADEMY POINTE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1282

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CURRY CHRIS

Respondents and Defendants

ACADEMY POINTE INC

ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY

STATEWIDE ENTERPRISES INC

DOES 1-50

STATEWIDE ENTERPRISES INC GF SETTLMT

J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICE INC.

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

PURCELL CYNTHIA

J.K. REALTY INC.

SHELLEY DANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

REISMAN & REISMAN

PINE NORMAN HOWARD

Defendant Attorneys

CAMERON PARRY G.

O'MEARA FRANCES ESQ.

CAMERON PARRY GLENN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

1/24/2018: PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

2/5/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

2/5/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

2/5/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

JUDGMENT ON SPECIAL VERDICT

2/26/2018: JUDGMENT ON SPECIAL VERDICT

DEFEDANTS ACADEMY POINTE, INC.'S AND J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES, INC.'S NOTICE OF ATTENTION TO MOVE FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT

3/13/2018: DEFEDANTS ACADEMY POINTE, INC.'S AND J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES, INC.'S NOTICE OF ATTENTION TO MOVE FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR NEW TRIAL

3/13/2018: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR NEW TRIAL

DEFENDANTS ACADEMY POINTE, INC.'S AND J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES, INC.'S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANI)ING THE VERDICT

3/13/2018: DEFENDANTS ACADEMY POINTE, INC.'S AND J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES, INC.'S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANI)ING THE VERDICT

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR NEW TRIAL

3/13/2018: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR NEW TRIAL

DECLARATION - OF JUROR DALTON HALLEEN

3/23/2018: DECLARATION - OF JUROR DALTON HALLEEN

DEFENDANTS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

3/23/2018: DEFENDANTS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

DEFENDANTS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT

3/23/2018: DEFENDANTS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT

DECLARATION - OF JUROR EDUARDO LANDIN

3/23/2018: DECLARATION - OF JUROR EDUARDO LANDIN

DECLARATION - ALICE LANDIN

3/23/2018: DECLARATION - ALICE LANDIN

DECLARATION OF PARRY G. CAMERON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? ACADEMY POINTE, INC., J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES, INC., AND ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY?S POSTTRIAL MOTIONS

3/23/2018: DECLARATION OF PARRY G. CAMERON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? ACADEMY POINTE, INC., J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES, INC., AND ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY?S POSTTRIAL MOTIONS

NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

4/12/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDCMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT

4/12/2018: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDCMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT

OBJECTION TO DECLARATIONS OF JURORS DALTON HALLEEN AND EDUARDO LANDIN AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE TESTIMONY CONTAINED THEREIN, ETC

4/23/2018: OBJECTION TO DECLARATIONS OF JURORS DALTON HALLEEN AND EDUARDO LANDIN AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE TESTIMONY CONTAINED THEREIN, ETC

117 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (CORRECTED NOTICE OF RULING); Filed by Chris Curry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Chris Curry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (*cont'd from 02/25/21*) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees *cont'd from 02/25/21*) of 03/25/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketOrder (granting in part mtn for atty fees on appeal); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees *cont'd from 02/25/21*)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (as to Linda Lee, #13568)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketObjection (to Declaration of Scott Tillett in Support of Plaintiff's Reply Re Motion for Attorney's Fees on Appeal); Filed by Academy Pointe, Inc (Defendant); Anza Management Company (Defendant); J.K. Residential Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration (of James P. Schratz in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees on Appeal); Filed by Academy Pointe, Inc (Defendant); Anza Management Company (Defendant); J.K. Residential Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOpposition ([Supplemental] to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees on Appeal); Filed by Academy Pointe, Inc (Defendant); Anza Management Company (Defendant); J.K. Residential Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
216 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by StateWide Enterprises, Inc GF SETTLMT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, ACADEMY POINTE, INC. AND ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Academy Pointe, Inc (Defendant); Anza Management Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Chris Curry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Chris Curry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES FOR HOUSING AND PUBLIC ACCOMMODATION DISCRIMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC621282    Hearing Date: February 25, 2021    Dept: 36

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 36

CHRIS CURRY,

Plaintiff,

v.

ACADEMY POINTE, INC., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC621282

Hearing Date: 2/25/2021

[TENTATIVE] RULING RE: Motion to Award Attorney’s Fees on Appeal

The motion is continued to 03/25/21 at 8:30 am.

Plaintiff is to file proof of service of the reply, declaration, and objections within five days.

Defendants are permitted to file a supplemental response limited to the supplemental evidence filed with the reply within ten days.

Notice; Reply Evidence

Plaintiff moves for an award of attorney’s fees on appeal and fees for this motion. (Mot. at pp. 2, 9.) Defendants oppose on grounds that Plaintiff is not a prevailing party, and alternatively, on grounds that Plaintiff is not entitled to the attorney’s fees requested, relying in primary part on the declaration of James P. Schratz and audit of the Plaintiff’s billing submitted with the Motion. (See generally Opp.) Plaintiff on reply offers the declaration of Scott Tillett, attacking the credibility and grounds of Mr. Schratz’s declaration, and attesting to additional hours for drafting the reply and reply declaration in this motion. (See generally Reply.)

The general rule of motion practice is that new evidence is not permitted with reply papers. (Jay v. Mahaffey (2013) 218 Cal.App.4th 1522, 1537.) When inclusion of such evidence is permitted, the other party should be given the opportunity to respond. (See id.)

Next, Plaintiff has failed to include a Proof of Service with his reply brief or evidence in support showing timely service thereof. (See CCP § 1005(b).)

Based on the foregoing, the motion is continued. Plaintiff is to file proof of service of the reply, declaration, and objections within five days. Defendants are permitted to file a supplemental response limited to the supplemental evidence filed with the reply within ten days.

Dated: ____________________________

Gregory Alarcon

Superior Court Judge

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACADEMY POINTE INC (DOE 1) is a litigant

Latest cases where ANZA MANAGEMENT COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where STATEWIDE ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant