This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2019 at 08:42:21 (UTC).

CHIKA NWAGWU VS CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE

Case Summary

On 11/02/2016 CHIKA NWAGWU filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING WELLNESS CENTRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN P. DOYLE and JOSEPH R. KALIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9079

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN P. DOYLE

JOSEPH R. KALIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NWAGWU CHIKA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 200

CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS

BRIUS LLC

CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS DBA CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE

MAY ALVIN

AMERIWOUND LLC

WOUND MD PC

OFOEGBU M.D. KINGSLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PECK STEVEN C. ESQ.

PECK STEVEN CHARLES ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KATZ MARC ESQ.

KATZ MARC STEVEN ESQ.

MCKENNA ROBERT LOWELL III

BADAWIYA RIMA M

 

Court Documents

Request for Judicial Notice

10/31/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

10/31/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

3/7/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.

6/18/2018: DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS AMERIWOUND, LLC AND DR. ALVIN MAY; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/25/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS AMERIWOUND, LLC AND DR. ALVIN MAY; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Minute Order

7/23/2018: Minute Order

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

11/28/2016: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

[VOLUME 2 OF 15] DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE DBA CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE AND BRIUS, LLC'S NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY

9/28/2017: [VOLUME 2 OF 15] DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE DBA CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE AND BRIUS, LLC'S NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY

[VOLUME 14 OF 15] DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE DBA CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE AND BRIUS, LLC'S NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY

9/28/2017: [VOLUME 14 OF 15] DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE DBA CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE AND BRIUS, LLC'S NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY

DECLARATION OF S. KWON LEE, MD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/28/2017: DECLARATION OF S. KWON LEE, MD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

(VOLUME 4 OF 15) DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE DBA CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE AND BRIUS, LLC'S NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY

9/28/2017: (VOLUME 4 OF 15) DEFENDANT CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE DBA CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE AND BRIUS, LLC'S NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE WEST, LLC DBA CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE AND BRIUS, LLC

11/30/2017: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE WEST, LLC DBA CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE AND BRIUS, LLC

RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE WEST, LLC DBA CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE; ETC

11/30/2017: RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE WEST, LLC DBA CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE; ETC

DECLARATION OF ADAM J. PECK IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OF DEFENDANTS, CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE WEST, LLC DBA CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE; BRIUS, L

11/30/2017: DECLARATION OF ADAM J. PECK IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OF DEFENDANTS, CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE WEST, LLC DBA CENTINELA SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE; BRIUS, L

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

12/1/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/1/2017: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARTION OF ADAM J. PECK, ESQ. SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT'

12/8/2017: DEFENDANTS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARTION OF ADAM J. PECK, ESQ. SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT'

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (name extension) (to Continue Trial to Allow Motion for Summary Judgment to be Heard) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial to Allow Mo...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (name extension) (Ex Parte to Continue Trial to Allow Motion for Summary Judgment to be Heard); Filed by Kingsley Ofoegbu, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Ameriwound, LLC (Defendant); Alvin May (Defendant); Wound MD PC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 58; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 01/08/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Centinela Skilled Nursing & Wellness (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Notice (name extension) (of Advancement of Hearings); Filed by Kingsley Ofoegbu, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
206 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE (PURSUANT TO WELFARE AND INSTITUTIONS CODE 156OO, ET. SEQ.); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Chika Nwagwu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC639079    Hearing Date: November 14, 2019    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: November 14, 2019

Case Name: Nwagwu v. Centinela Skilled Nursing & Wellness Centre West LLC, et al.

Case No.: BC639079

Motion: Motion to Remove Guardian Ad Litem

Moving Party: Defendant Centinela Skilled Nursing & Wellness Centre LLC

Responding Party: Unopposed

Tentative Ruling: The Motion is denied.

This is an action arising from Plaintiff’s alleged development and infection of a pressure ulcer on her left heel. The operative Second Amended Complaint (“SAC”) asserts causes of action for (1) elder abuse, (2) negligence, and (3) violation of residents’ rights

Defendant Centinela Skilled Nursing & Wellness Centre (“Defendant”) moves for an order removing Plaintiff’s guardian ad litem.

On September 18, 2019, the Court tentatively denied the instant Motion without prejudice. However, the Court ultimately continued the Motion.

As nothing new has been submitted, the Motion is denied.