This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 23:48:49 (UTC).

CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY VS ANGELA G. COTTON, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2016 CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANGELA G COTTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. MATZ and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4539

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. MATZ

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

WILLIAMS ANDREW

COTTON ANGELA G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOON JENNIFER J.

ROUSSO MARY A.

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: COMPLAINT FILED-SUMMONS ISSUED

1/12/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: COMPLAINT FILED-SUMMONS ISSUED

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2016-03-29 00:00:00

3/29/2016: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2016-03-29 00:00:00

Case Management Statement

5/27/2016: Case Management Statement

Application

8/8/2016: Application

Proof of Publication

9/27/2016: Proof of Publication

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2016-10-05 00:00:00

10/5/2016: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2016-10-05 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFAULT ENTERED

11/2/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFAULT ENTERED

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

2/3/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/7/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

2/7/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

6/30/2017: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

11/17/2017: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/16/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

8/31/2018: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION RE: (ASSIGNMENT ORDER AND RESTRAINING ORDER)

9/8/2020: Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION RE: (ASSIGNMENT ORDER AND RESTRAINING ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER ASSIGNMENT ORDER AND RESTRAINING ORDER)

10/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER ASSIGNMENT ORDER AND RESTRAINING ORDER)

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

11/27/2018: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Proof of Service - No Service

1/4/2019: Proof of Service - No Service

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketOrder (ASSIGNMENT; RESTRAINING ORDER); Filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Assignment Order and Restraining Order) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Assignment Order and Restraining Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketMotion re: (Motion re: (Assignment Order and Restraining Order)); Filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Custodian of Records, HSBC Bank USA) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketNotice (of osc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketNotice of Related Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC064539    Hearing Date: October 23, 2020    Dept: E

MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER AND FOR ORDER RESTRAINING JUDGMENT DEBTOR

[CCP §§ 708.510, 708.520]

Date: 10/23/20 (8:30 AM)

Case: Chicago Title Insurance Company v. Angela G. Cotton et al. (EC064539)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Judgment Creditor Chicago Title Insurance Company’s UNOPPOSED Motion for Assignment Order and for Order Restraining Judgment Debtor is GRANTED.

Judgment creditor’s requests for judicial notice as to Exhibits A is GRANTED, pursuant to Evidence Code § 452(d). Judgment creditor’s requests for judicial notice as to Exhibits B is GRANTED, pursuant to Evidence Code § 452(c). Judgment creditor’s requests for judicial notice as to Exhibits C, D, and E are GRANTED pursuant to Evidence Code §§ 452(g) and (h), but only for the limited purposes set forth in Fontenot v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (2011) 198 Cal.App.4th 256, 265. (Fontenot, 198 Cal.App.4th 256, at 265 [“Taken together, the decisions discussed above establish that a court may take judicial notice of the fact of a document's recordation, the date the document was recorded and executed, the parties to the transaction reflected in a recorded document, and the document's legally operative language, assuming there is no genuine dispute regarding the document's authenticity”].”)

The motion for assignment order is granted. Pursuant to CCP § 708.510, judgment debtor Andrew Williams is ordered to assign to the judgment creditor Chicago Title Insurance Company rights to payment from AIW Investments, Inc. (“AIW”), which may take the form of money, benefits (tangible or intangible), professional consulting fees, salary, bonus, commission, stock and stock options, stock dividends, sharehold interest, sharehold dividends, shareholder distributions, corporate dividends, rents, lease payments, reimbursement of loan payments made by Williams on behalf or for the benefit of AIW for certain real property located at 5677 McKinley Avenue, San Bernardino, CA 92406 (the "McKinley Property"), and any and all other reimbursements for monies advanced by Williams on behalf of AIW that may be paid to Judgment Debtor, whether directly or indirectly through AIW or some other third party, and whether or not such right is conditioned on future developments to the extent necessary to pay Judgment Creditor's judgment in full.

The assignments are not to exceed the amount of $142,748.55, plus ten percent per annum interest on this amount from February 8, 2017 to the date of the assignment.

The motion for restraining order is GRANTED. Counsel for judgment creditor’s declaration demonstrates that judgment debtor knows of the possibility of transferring assets from one entity to another, as illustrated by the shifting of ownership in the McKinley Property from Williams to AIW and back to Williams. (RJN Exs. C-E.) Judgment creditor demonstrates the possibility that judgment debtor may attempt to assign the rights to payment from AIW to another entity to evade collection on the judgment entered on February 8, 2017 (RJN Ex. A.)

Judgment debtor Andrew Williams is restrained and prohibited from transferring, encumbering, assigning, disposing or spending any of his rights to payment assigned under the Assignment Order prior to the satisfaction of the judgment creditor's judgment. This restraining order shall remain effective until further order of this Court.