This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 11:29:26 (UTC).

CHERYL BALDINGER VS BIKRAM CHOUDHURY YOGA INC

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 CHERYL BALDINGER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BIKRAM CHOUDHURY YOGA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7043

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BALDINGER CHERYL

Defendants and Respondents

BIKRAM CHOUDHURY YOGA INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

DANISH ENVIROMENT INC. ROES1

Cross Defendant

BIKRAM'S YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA LP DOE1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ELLIS LAW CORPORATION

ELLIS ANDREW LAWRENCE

Defendant Attorney

PALTA AMIT

Cross Defendant Attorney

WILCOX WENDY L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

2/14/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

2/27/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/17/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5/4/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR TOTAL INDEMNITY, IMPLIED PARTIAL INDEMNITY, DECLARATORY RELIEF, EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT AND EXPRESS INDEMNITY

5/30/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR TOTAL INDEMNITY, IMPLIED PARTIAL INDEMNITY, DECLARATORY RELIEF, EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT AND EXPRESS INDEMNITY

DECLARATION OF SUZANNE E. GREEN ON BEHALF OF BIKRAM YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA LP, IN SUPPORT OF DANISH ENVIRONMENT, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

8/29/2018: DECLARATION OF SUZANNE E. GREEN ON BEHALF OF BIKRAM YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA LP, IN SUPPORT OF DANISH ENVIRONMENT, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

9/4/2018: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Minute Order

9/4/2018: Minute Order

Motion to Compel Discovery

3/1/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery

Opposition

3/18/2019: Opposition

Order

3/29/2019: Order

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/12/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

10/12/2016: SUMMONS

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

7/17/2017: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

7/28/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

7/31/2017: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

BIKRAM YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA LP ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS BIKRAM CHOUDHURY YOGA, INC'S CROSSCOMPLAINT

10/26/2017: BIKRAM YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA LP ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS BIKRAM CHOUDHURY YOGA, INC'S CROSSCOMPLAINT

BIKRAM YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA LP, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS BIKRAM CHOUDHURVYOCA, INC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/26/2017: BIKRAM YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA LP, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS BIKRAM CHOUDHURVYOCA, INC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Notice (of Ruling on Motion to Compel attendance at IME); Filed by Bikram Choudhury Yoga, Inc. (Defendant); BIKRAM'S YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA LP DOE1 (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Order (By the Court grants motion to compel IME and impose sanctions); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Demand for Physical Examination; and Request for Order Awarding a Monetary Sanction Against Plaintiff Cheryl Baldinger and/or her Attorney in the Sum of $2,715.00); Filed by BIKRAM'S YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA LP DOE1 (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Opposition ( to Defendant's Motion to Compel IME and Request for Sanctions); Filed by Cheryl Baldinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by BIKRAM'S YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA LP DOE1 (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial Date and all Related Pre-Trial and Discovery Deadlines) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2017
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by BIKRAM'S YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA LP DOE1 (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Answer; Filed by BIKRAM'S YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA LP DOE1 (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Cheryl Baldinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Application for Order to Publish; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Cheryl Baldinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC637043    Hearing Date: January 22, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

CHERYL BALDINGER,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

BIKRAM YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA, LP, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC637043

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 22, 2020

Defendant propounded a deposition subpoena for production of business records on non-party, Yasmine Tsu, on 5/24/19, setting her deposition for 6/13/19. Tsu failed to appear, and Defendant moves to compel compliance at this time.

The motion is denied without prejudice due to failure to file proof of personal service of the moving papers on Tsu. See CRC 3.1346, which provides that all moving papers must be personally served on a non-party deponent. Defendant filed proof of service of the moving papers on Plaintiff and Co-Defendant, but not on the third party witness.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.