This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 17:42:35 (UTC).

CHEQUIRA ANN COTTON VS. SOUTHCOAST AUTOMOTIVE

Case Summary

On 11/13/2015 CHEQUIRA ANN COTTON filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against SOUTHCOAST AUTOMOTIVE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5142

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COTTON CHEQUIRA ANN

Defendants

GALAXY AUTO MALL

VEROS CREDIT UNION

SOUTHCOAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC.

VEROS CREDIT LLC A NEVADA LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OTTO & GUILLEN PC LAW OFFICE OF

Defendant Attorneys

MADISON HARBOR

HARBOR MADISON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Post-Arbitration Status Conference (Post Arbitration Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Post Arbitration Status Conference (C/F 01/17/18) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CHEQUIRA ANN COTTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE RE COMPLAINT; ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Post-Arbitration Status Conference (Post Arbitration Status Conference; Not Held-Continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Post Arbitration Status Conference (C/F 08/01/17) - Not Held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketNotice (OF ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by CHEQUIRA ANN COTTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Post Arbitration Status Conference (C/F 1/24/17) - Matter heard, matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVICE ON: SOUTHCOAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA GALAXY AUTO MALL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by CHEQUIRA ANN COTTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVICE ON: VEROS CREDIT, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by CHEQUIRA ANN COTTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by CHEQUIRA ANN COTTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHCOAST AUTOMOTIVE LIQUIDATORS INC DBA GALAXY AUTO MALL AKA DISCOUNT AUTO PLAZA AKA CAR LEGACY is a litigant

Latest cases where GALAXY AUTO MALL A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM is a litigant

Latest cases where Veros Credit, LLC is a litigant