This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 17:40:04 (UTC).

CHARLES U ODIASE VS JACOB SHOE TEX LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/01/2016 CHARLES U ODIASE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JACOB SHOE TEX LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2275

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ODIASE CHARLES U.

Defendants and Respondents

KALAYDJIAN SILVIA

JACOB SHOE TEX LLC

KALAYDJIAN JACOB

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

KECHICHIAN SERVART A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ODIASE CHARLES UWA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

2/9/2017: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

1/11/2018: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

RULING RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

1/30/2018: RULING RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Minute Order

4/16/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/1/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/1/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/26/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

12/1/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. FRAUD 3. VIOLATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 17200 ET SEQ

12/1/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. FRAUD 3. VIOLATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 17200 ET SEQ

Unknown

3/15/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

3/29/2017: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/12/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/12/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/19/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

7/6/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/16/2017: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/22/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

12/1/2017: Minute Order

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: (Contempt for Plaintiff's Failure to Appear at the 01/16/19 Order to Show Cause hearing) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; (Order to Show Cause) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : Order to Show Cause; Order to Show Cause ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; (Order to Show Cause) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Order to Show Cause)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Order to Show Cause) of 01/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-03-29 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. FRAUD 3. VIOLATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 17200 ET SEQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Charles U. Odiase (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC642275    Hearing Date: November 30, 2020    Dept: 78

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 78

CHARLES U. ODIASE.;

Plaintiff,

vs.

JACOB SHOE TEX LLC, et al.;

Defendant.

Case No.:

BC642275

Hearing Date:

November 30, 2020

[TENTATIVE] RULING RE:

request for entry of default judgment.

Plaintiff Charles Odiase’s (“Odiase”) seeks entry of default judgment against Defendant Jacob Kalaydjian.

Odiase filed the instant Request for Entry of Default Judgment on November 20, 2020. However, Odiase has not dismissed Doe Defendants 1-50, as directed by the Court on October 5, 2020. On October 5, 2020, Odiase filed a Request for Dismissal as to Defendants Servert Kechichian and Jacob Shoe Tex LLC.

Further, as similarly addressed in the December 5, 2019, Odiase continues to seek principal damages in the amount of $93,555.00, while the Complaint only alleges damages of $90,000. (Complaint ¶ 23.) “The relief granted to the plaintiff, if there is no answer, cannot exceed that demanded in the complaint . . . .” (Code Civ. Proc. § 580, subd. (a).)

Accordingly, Odiase must file a Request for Dismissal as to the Doe Defendants 1 through 50, may not recover principal damages more than $90,000.

Plaintiff Odiase’s Request for Entry of Default Judgment is DENIED without prejudice.

DATED: November 30, 2020

________________________________

Hon. Robert S. Draper

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ODIASE CHARLES U. ESQ.