This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2016 at 23:44:05 (UTC).

CHARLES STEWART VS RIVIERA CENTER MANAGEMENT, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/09/2012 CHARLES STEWART filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RIVIERA CENTER MANAGEMENT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9055

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEWART CHARLES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DAVIS MURPHY TRUST

DAVIS ROBERT L.

DBA HASTING RANCH SHOPPING CENTER

DBA HASTINGS RANCH SHOPPING CENTER

RIVIERA CENTER MANAGEMENT INC.;

RIVIERA CENTER MANAGEMENT INC.

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

HASTING RANCH SHOPPING CENTER

DAVIS ROBERT L

MURPHY DAVIS(TRUST)

J&J MAINTENANCEJARRODSMITH&JUSTINSMITHDBA

Cross Defendants

CHICK WIDE SHOES INC.

CHIC WIDE SHOES INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GOLDSMITH & HULL P.C.

GOLDSMITH & HULL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

EARLY MASLACH & O'SHEA

BALLARD MELISSA M. LAW OFFICES OF

Cross Defendant Attorneys

NEWCOMB LAW OFFICES

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/4/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

7/1/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ORDER THEREON

9/25/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND ORDER THEREON

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/2/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO FL COURT

4/16/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO FL COURT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/6/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

CROSS-DEFENDANT CHIC WIDE SHOES, INC.?S ANSWER TO J & J MAINTENANCE, JARROD SMITH & JUSTIN SMITH DBA.?S CROSSCOMPLAINT

8/20/2013: CROSS-DEFENDANT CHIC WIDE SHOES, INC.?S ANSWER TO J & J MAINTENANCE, JARROD SMITH & JUSTIN SMITH DBA.?S CROSSCOMPLAINT

STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ORDER

9/20/2013: STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ORDER

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/20/2013: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

STIPULATION TO COTINUE TRIAL AND DISCOVERY CUTOFF

4/25/2013: STIPULATION TO COTINUE TRIAL AND DISCOVERY CUTOFF

CROSS COMPLAINT FOR IMPLIED INDEMNIFICATION NEGLIGENCE AND COMPARATIVE FAULT NEGLIGENCE

4/23/2013: CROSS COMPLAINT FOR IMPLIED INDEMNIFICATION NEGLIGENCE AND COMPARATIVE FAULT NEGLIGENCE

SUMMONS-CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/23/2013: SUMMONS-CROSS-COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2014
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY J&J MAINTENANCE JARROD SMITH & JUSTIN SMITH DBA ON 4/23/13; ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (entire action w/prej ) Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • Notice (of entry re stip to continue trial date and order thereon ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • Stipulation and Order (TO CONT FSC AND TRL DATES (ENTRY MADE UNDER PASADENA SUSTAIN ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • Stipulation (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND DISCOVERY CUTT OFF ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • Cross-complaint filed Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • Notice (of OSC re trial court delay reduction ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.