This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2015 at 23:13:46 (UTC).

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC VS JOHN DUGAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/06/2012 CHARLES SCHWAB CO INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against JOHN DUGAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ALAN S. ROSENFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5318

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALAN S. ROSENFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO. INC.

Defendants

DUGAN JOHN

JOHN DUGAN AND KAREN DUGAN JTWROS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEST EVELYN C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

1/6/2012: PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/11/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

2/15/2012: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

DECLARATION OF EVELYN C. BEST IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

2/15/2012: DECLARATION OF EVELYN C. BEST IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT?CIVIL

2/15/2012: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT?CIVIL

PETITIONER?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

2/15/2012: PETITIONER?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

PETITIONER?S JUDGMENT

3/7/2012: PETITIONER?S JUDGMENT

ORDER GRANTING S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

3/7/2012: ORDER GRANTING S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

Minute Order

3/7/2012: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

3/8/2012: NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD