This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2019 at 08:52:55 (UTC).

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC VS EMMETTE R BEGLEY IRA ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/15/2012 CHARLES SCHWAB CO INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against EMMETTE R BEGLEY IRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6160

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO. INC.

Defendants and Respondents

CAROLE G. BEGLEY IRA

EMMETTE R. BEGLEY SEP-IRA

EMMETTE R. BEGLEY IRA

SEP-IRA EMMETTE R. BEGLEY

IRA CAROLE G. BEGLEY

IRA EMMETTE R. BEGLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BEST EVELYN C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

2/15/2012: PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/22/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATON AWARD

3/13/2012: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATON AWARD

DECLARATION OF EVELYN C. BEST IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

3/13/2012: DECLARATION OF EVELYN C. BEST IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT?CIVIL

3/26/2012: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT?CIVIL

Minute Order

4/27/2012: Minute Order

ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

5/4/2012: ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

PETITIONER?S JUDGMENT

5/4/2012: PETITIONER?S JUDGMENT

Minute Order

5/4/2012: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2012
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 55; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 55; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • PETITIONERS JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 55; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award (Petition Confirm Arbitration Award; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPTCIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • DECLARATION OF EVELYN C. BEST IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATON AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • Declaration; Filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • Petition; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less