This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2015 at 00:03:32 (UTC).

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC ET AL VS RICHARD E SCHREIBER IRA ET

Case Summary

On 08/24/2011 CHARLES SCHWAB CO INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against RICHARD E SCHREIBER IRA ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT L. HESS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3464

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT L. HESS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO. INC.

CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION THE

CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendants

RICHARD E. SCHREIBER IRA

SCHREIBER RICHARD E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEST EVELYN C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PETITIONERS CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION AND CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT. INC.S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

8/24/2011: PETITIONERS CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION AND CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT. INC.S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

9/23/2011: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

PETITIONERS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

9/23/2011: PETITIONERS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

DECLARATION OF EVELYN C. BEST IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

9/23/2011: DECLARATION OF EVELYN C. BEST IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPTCIVIL

9/23/2011: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPTCIVIL

Minute Order

10/13/2011: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

10/17/2011: NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

Minute Order

1/12/2012: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2011
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less