This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2016 at 00:43:03 (UTC).

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC ET AL VS CLASS ACTION WATCH ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2012 CHARLES SCHWAB CO INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against CLASS ACTION WATCH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5746

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO. INC.

CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION THE

CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendants and Respondents

BEECHAM DAVID

BEECHAM JESSIE

CLASS ACTION WATCH

DAVIDSON JERRY L.

DAVIDSON KATHLEEN M.

WILLIAMS CHRIS K.

WILLIAMS DEBORAH J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BEST EVELYN C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PETITIONERS CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC., THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION AND CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT INC.?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

1/31/2012: PETITIONERS CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC., THE CHARLES SCHWAB CORPORATION AND CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT INC.?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/16/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT?CIVIL

2/21/2012: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT?CIVIL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

2/21/2012: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

DECLARATION OF EVELYN C. BEST IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS? PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

2/21/2012: DECLARATION OF EVELYN C. BEST IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS? PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

PETITIONERS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS? PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

2/21/2012: PETITIONERS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS? PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

Minute Order

4/4/2012: Minute Order

ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS? PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

4/4/2012: ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS? PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

PETITIONERS? JUDGMENT

4/4/2012: PETITIONERS? JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

4/9/2012: NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2012
  • Notice of Ruling (RE MOTION TO CONFRIM ARBITRATION AWARD ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (PARTY SERVED: BRIAN D. MILLER, ESQ., MILLER & MILOVE, SAN DIEGO, CA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • Points and Authorities (IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS' PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • Notice of Motion (AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • Declaration (OF EVELYN C. BEST IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS' PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less