This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2019 at 06:25:15 (UTC).

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO INC ET AL VS BRUCE JAMES ROGOVIN

Case Summary

On 02/15/2012 CHARLES SCHWAB CO INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against BRUCE JAMES ROGOVIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6158

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO. INC.

CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT INC

LEWANDOWSKI ROBERT EDWARD

SCHWAB INVESTMENTS

Defendant and Respondent

ROGOVIN BRUCE JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BEST EVELYN C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PETITIONERS CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC., SCHWAB INVESTMENTS, CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC., AND ROBERT EDWARD LEWANDOWSKI?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

2/15/2012: PETITIONERS CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC., SCHWAB INVESTMENTS, CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC., AND ROBERT EDWARD LEWANDOWSKI?S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/1/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PETITIONERS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS? PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

3/6/2012: PETITIONERS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS? PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

3/6/2012: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

DECLARATION OF EVELYN C. BEST IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS? PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

3/6/2012: DECLARATION OF EVELYN C. BEST IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS? PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

Unknown

3/21/2012: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

4/12/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

POPGMWI7 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS? PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

4/20/2012: POPGMWI7 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS? PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

JUDGMENT

4/20/2012: JUDGMENT

Minute Order

4/20/2012: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

4/25/2012: NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2012
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 45; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • at 08:35 AM in Department 45; Hearing on Motion for Order (name extension) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • Judgment; Filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • POPGMWI7 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • Order; Filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAILCIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2012
  • PETITIONERS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • DECLARATION OF EVELYN C. BEST IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • Points and Authorities; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • Motion; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • Petition; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • PETITIONERS CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC., SCHWAB INVESTMENTS, CHARLES SCHWAB INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC., AND ROBERT EDWARD LEWANDOWSKIS PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less