This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2020 at 07:36:39 (UTC).

CHARLES FRADIN ET AL VS THE NASA GROUP ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/23/2009 CHARLES FRADIN filed an Other lawsuit against THE NASA GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES C. CHALFANT, YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS, KEVIN C. BRAZILE and MATTHEW ST. GEORGE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2323

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JAMES C. CHALFANT

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRADIN CHARLES

FRADIN SUSAN GELLER

Defendants

DMCF LLC DBA CF STYLE (DOE 2)

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

MCCALLEN DAVID (DOE 1)

RAE AMEY ENTERPRISES INC. (DOE 3)

THE NASA GROUP

THE NASA GROUP INC.

THE NASA GROUP LLC

ZAD SINA

DMCF LLC DBA CF STYLE DOE 2

MCCALLEN DAVID DOE 1

RAE AMEY ENTERPRISES INC. DOE 3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

ANDREWS WILLIAM M.

SIDERMAN MEYERS MCCONNELL REISZ

ELEY HUNTER R.

BURTON STEVEN E. ESQ.

POTEPAN JAMES C. ESQ.

ROSENBERG & KOFFMAN LAW OFFICES OF

DRUCKER MICHAEL S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT MCCALLEN AND DMCFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY AD.JUDICATION ON PLAINTIFFS1 CLAIM FOR TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION

4/22/2011: DEFENDANT MCCALLEN AND DMCFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY AD.JUDICATION ON PLAINTIFFS1 CLAIM FOR TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION

DECLARATION OF COURTNEY E. CURTIS IVOLUME II OF II WITH EXHIBITS 30-321 IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION

4/22/2011: DECLARATION OF COURTNEY E. CURTIS IVOLUME II OF II WITH EXHIBITS 30-321 IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION

NOTICE OF ORDER DISMISSINC THE ACTION FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION AND FOR FAILURE; TO APPEAR FOR TRIAL

5/13/2011: NOTICE OF ORDER DISMISSINC THE ACTION FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION AND FOR FAILURE; TO APPEAR FOR TRIAL

DEFENDANTS MCCALLEN AND DMCFS MEMO RAN DUM OF POINTS ANT) AUTIIORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER STRIKING AND/OR TAXING MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

8/31/2011: DEFENDANTS MCCALLEN AND DMCFS MEMO RAN DUM OF POINTS ANT) AUTIIORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER STRIKING AND/OR TAXING MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 1A; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 1A; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by McCallen, David (Doe 1) (Defendant); DMCF LLC dba CF STYLE (Doe 2) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by McCallen, David (Doe 1) (Defendant); DMCF LLC dba CF STYLE (Doe 2) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION (ATTACHMENTENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
536 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2009
  • DocketPLAINTIFF CHARLES FRADIN AND SUSAN GELLER FRADIN'S NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONVERSION AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Charles Fradin (Plaintiff); Susan Geller Fradin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • DocketOrder, Preliminary Injunction; Filed by Charles Fradin (Plaintiff); Susan Geller Fradin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by Charles Fradin (Plaintiff); Susan Geller Fradin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Charles Fradin (Plaintiff); Susan Geller Fradin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Charles Fradin (Plaintiff); Susan Geller Fradin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less