This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2019 at 10:50:01 (UTC).

CHARLES ANYADIKE VS SAMUEL O. EVERO

Case Summary

On 07/17/2015 CHARLES ANYADIKE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SAMUEL O EVERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0724

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANYADIKE CHARLES

ANYADIKE PAMELA

Defendant

EVERO SAMUEL O.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

A.O.E. LAW & ASSOCIATES INC.

Defendant Attorneys

OLIVER O. OLUMBA SBA

SBA OLIVER O. OLUMBA

 

Court Documents

Declaration

9/17/2018: Declaration

Ex Parte Application

9/17/2018: Ex Parte Application

Unknown

10/29/2018: Unknown

Clerk's Declaration re: Search and Order to Deem Copy as Original

11/28/2018: Clerk's Declaration re: Search and Order to Deem Copy as Original

Order

12/24/2018: Order

Unknown

1/17/2019: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • Writ - Return; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Order (Clerk's Declaration re: Search and Order to Deem Copy as Original)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Clerk's Declaration re: Search and Order to Deem Copy as Original; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Ex Parte Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Declaration in support of ex parte application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by CHARLES ANYADIKE (Plaintiff); PAMELA ANYADIKE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by CHARLES ANYADIKE (Plaintiff); PAMELA ANYADIKE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Order

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by SAMUEL O. EVERO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by CHARLES ANYADIKE (Plaintiff); PAMELA ANYADIKE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-12-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SAMUEL O. EVERO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer; Filed by SAMUEL O. EVERO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by CHARLES ANYADIKE (Plaintiff); PAMELA ANYADIKE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.