This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 17:48:17 (UTC).

CHARLENE COPFER VS. WALMART, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 05/25/2012 CHARLENE COPFER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6518

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COPFER CHARLENE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ENVIRONMENTAL DEVELOPMENT GROUP

BEESE AMIR M.

DOES 1 TO 25

GRANT COUNTY EXCAVATION INC.

WAL-MART STORES INC.

ROES 1 TO 20

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

WAL-MART STORES INC.

Not Classified By Court

WALMART

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLO DAVID H. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BRADLEY & GMELICH LAW OFFICE OF

PETTIT KOHN INGRASSIA & LUTZ PC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

10/17/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/1/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND HANDLING ATTORNEY

9/24/2013: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND HANDLING ATTORNEY

STIPULATION THAT SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF, CHARLENE COPFER AND DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT, GRANT COUNTY EXCAVATION, INC. DBA ENVIRONMENTAL DEVELOPMENT GROUP IS IN GOOD FAITH PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIV

6/3/2013: STIPULATION THAT SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF, CHARLENE COPFER AND DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT, GRANT COUNTY EXCAVATION, INC. DBA ENVIRONMENTAL DEVELOPMENT GROUP IS IN GOOD FAITH PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIV

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/25/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

8/14/2014: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

7/17/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

11/4/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

7/17/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/1/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF NAME OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

8/16/2013: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF NAME OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • Notice ( of change of Name of Handling Attorne LAUREN E. SCHUE ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S ( (2) Documents ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (re: deft. Grant County Excavation Inc. only ) Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (re deft Wal Mart Stores Inc. only ) Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • Stipulation and Order (DEFENDANT'S RE SETTLEMENT IN GOOD FAITH PURSUANT TO CCP 887.6 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • Stipulation and Order (FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2012
  • Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons (& STATEMENT OF DAMAGES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.