This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 00:06:44 (UTC).

CHANG'S BEST LLC VS JSL PLAZA PUENTE HILLS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/19/2011 CHANG'S BEST LLC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against JSL PLAZA PUENTE HILLS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOANNE O'DONNELL and DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5509

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOANNE O'DONNELL

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CHANG'S BEST LLC

JADE HOUSE

Defendants

DOES 1 - 10

JSL PLAZA PUENTE HILLS LLC

JTNA MANAGEMENT INC.

LIU JOSEPH

Not Classified By Court

GOLDFARB BARBARA E. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUMMINGS CHARLES D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

DECKER RICHARD J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

12/19/2011: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR FRAUD AND ACCOUNTING

12/19/2011: COMPLAINT FOR FRAUD AND ACCOUNTING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/4/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/17/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DEFENDANTS? ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF COVENANT, ACCOUNTING, AND FRAUD

1/17/2012: DEFENDANTS? ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF COVENANT, ACCOUNTING, AND FRAUD

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/20/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

3/7/2012: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

4/4/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

4/19/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR

5/2/2012: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR

NOTICE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) HEARING

7/19/2012: NOTICE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) HEARING

STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT

9/27/2012: STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT

Minute Order -

10/1/2012: Minute Order -

JOIN]? STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTITUJ THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL ATTENDANT PRETRIAL. DEADLINES

10/1/2012: JOIN]? STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTITUJ THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL ATTENDANT PRETRIAL. DEADLINES

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

4/30/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

5/20/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

5/31/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order -

6/12/2013: Minute Order -

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 47; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Chang's Best, LLC (Plaintiff); Jade House (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Chang's Best, LLC (Plaintiff); Jade House (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Chang's Best, LLC (Plaintiff); Jade House (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 47; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Chang's Best, LLC (Plaintiff); Jade House (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANTS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF COVENANT, ACCOUNTING, AND FRAUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Chang's Best, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FRAUD AND ACCOUNTING

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JADE HOUSE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JTNA MANAGEMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where JSL PLAZA PUENTE HILLS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DECKER RICHARD J.