This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 01:15:35 (UTC).

CHANDRA TATE ET AL VS M P TIRE SERVICE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/03/2016 CHANDRA TATE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against M P TIRE SERVICE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9522

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

TATE CHANDRA

MCBRIDE GLYNNIS

Defendants and Respondents

M.P. TIRE SERVICE INC.

DOES 1 TO 20

ORELLANA VICTOR

AMAYA MARJORIE

PLEITEZ ANA MARJORIE

Plaintiff, Guardian Ad Litem and Petitioner

MCBRIDE GLYNNIS

Minor

CRAWFORD NEVAEH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorney

MERIDIAN LAW GROUP THE

Defendant Attorney

MIFFLIN KEN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/19/2018: Minute Order

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

7/30/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

8/30/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Minute Order

9/21/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/4/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

10/23/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

12/3/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/9/2019: Minute Order

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

3/8/2019: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

3/8/2019: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Notice

3/12/2019: Notice

Minute Order

4/11/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/3/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

1/13/2017: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

1/13/2017: CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

5/1/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

CROSS-DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITION; ETC.

10/17/2017: CROSS-DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITION; ETC.

Unknown

12/5/2017: Unknown

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference (, if Defendant files an Answer,) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Glynnis McBride (Plaintiff); Navaeh Crawford (Plaintiff); Chandra Tate (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference (, if Defendant files an Answer,) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Ord...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Glynnis McBride (Plaintiff); Navaeh Crawford (Plaintiff); Chandra Tate (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2017
  • CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Answer; Filed by M.P. Tire Service, Inc. (Defendant); Victor Orellana (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Glynnis McBride (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC639522    Hearing Date: May 19, 2021    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

CHANDRA TATE, et al.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

MP TIRE SERVICE, INC., et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

.: BC639522

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

Dept. 27

8:30 a.m.

May 19, 2021

Ken Mifflin, Esq. seeks to be relieved as counsel for Defendants Victor Orellana and M.P. Tire Services, Inc. Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted.  (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.)  However, this Motion is procedurally deficient.  The Motion must be accompanied by a declaration made on mandatory form MC-052 and a proposed order made on mandatory form MC-053.  (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362(c), (e).)  There is no declaration and Item 6 of the proposed order is blank.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

Dated this 19th day of May 2021

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr.

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M.P.TIRE INC. (ROE 2) BUSINESS FORM UNKN is a litigant