This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 17:38:25 (UTC).

CESAR R. GALDAMEZ VS. JOSE RAFAEL CHACON, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2012 CESAR R GALDAMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE RAFAEL CHACON, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and WILLIAM BARRY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6391

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

WILLIAM BARRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALDAMEZ CESAR R.

Defendants

CALIFORNIA CARTAGE COMPANY

CHACON JOSE RAFAEL

CONTAINERFREIGHT EIT LLC (DOE 1)

DOES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

CALIFORNIA CARTAGE COMPANY INC.

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERGKVIST BERGKVIST & CARTER

Defendant Attorneys

LA FOLLETTE JOHNSON DE HAAS FESLER &

SMITH KEVIN D.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

4/4/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

4/11/2013: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

STIPULATION OF COUNSEL ON EVIDENTIARY ISSUES FOR TRIAL

4/18/2013: STIPULATION OF COUNSEL ON EVIDENTIARY ISSUES FOR TRIAL

ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

4/23/2013: ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF TROY C. LEE, JR.; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF CONTINUANCE; ORDER THEREON

4/23/2013: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF TROY C. LEE, JR.; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF CONTINUANCE; ORDER THEREON

NOTICE OF TRIAL CONTINUANCE AND FINAL STATUS

4/26/2013: NOTICE OF TRIAL CONTINUANCE AND FINAL STATUS

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

4/29/2013: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Minute Order

6/7/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/15/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

7/16/2013: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/18/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2013
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 664.6) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • Association of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Notice (OF TRIAL CONTINUANCE AND FSC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • Stipulation (STIP TO CONT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • Order (ORDER CONT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • Stipulation (OF COUNSEL ON EVIDENTIARY ISSUES FOR TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Notice of Association of Attorneys Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • Miscellaneous-Other (DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • Amendment to Complaint (INSERTING CONTAINERFREIGHT EIT, LLC (DOE 1) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.