This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/29/2021 at 05:55:13 (UTC).

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON ET AL VS TRANSAMERICA

Case Summary

On 10/25/2013 CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against TRANSAMERICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY A. GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5830

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY A. GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CERTAIN LONDON MARKET INSURANCE COMPANIES

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON

Defendants and Respondents

TIG INSURANCE COMPANY

TRANSAMERICA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROTEN RUSSELL W. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DOLLINGER JEFFREY A.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

10/25/2013: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

10/25/2013: COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/6/2013: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND BREACH OF CONTRACT

1/10/2014: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND BREACH OF CONTRACT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/10/2014: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

2/10/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

PROOF OF SERVICE

2/14/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

3/24/2014: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

DEFFNDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR JUFLC;MEN1 ON TILE PLEADINGS (RE LONDON MARKET INSURERS? COMPLAINT)

4/25/2014: DEFFNDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR JUFLC;MEN1 ON TILE PLEADINGS (RE LONDON MARKET INSURERS? COMPLAINT)

LONDON MARKET INSURERS? REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, ETC

5/1/2014: LONDON MARKET INSURERS? REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, ETC

Minute Order -

5/8/2014: Minute Order -

AMENDED ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN FAVOR OF LONDON MARKET INSURERS. AND ETC

5/30/2014: AMENDED ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN FAVOR OF LONDON MARKET INSURERS. AND ETC

STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND CROSS COMPLAINT

7/17/2014: STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND CROSS COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

8/29/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

9/12/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

STIPULATION RE CONTINUING OSC HEARING AND ORDER

12/30/2014: STIPULATION RE CONTINUING OSC HEARING AND ORDER

Minute Order -

3/9/2015: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

6/8/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2015
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14; (OSC-Failure to File Request for Dism; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London (Plaintiff); Certain London Market Insurance Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14; (OSC-Failure to File Request for Dism; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketSTIPULATION RE CONTINUING OSC HEARING AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Transamerica Corporation (Defendant); TIG Insurance Company (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London (Plaintiff); Certain London Market Insurance Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London (Plaintiff); Certain London Market Insurance Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London (Plaintiff); Certain London Market Insurance Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2001
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Transamerica Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

. . FILED

Superior Court of California

Russell W. Roten (State Bar No. 170571) ounty of Los Angeles Robert J. Zapf (State Bar No. 183762)

DUANE MORRIS LLP FEB 14 2014

865 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3100 Los Angeles, California 90017-5450 Telephone: 213-689-7400

Fascimile: 213-689-7401

Sherri R Eaner Execytive Officer/Clerk By_ Yt~ _54,, g‘ D Victor Sino-Cruz Pl

Attorneys for Plaintiffs and Cross-Defendants, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd’s, London and Certain London Market Insurance Companies

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA IN AND FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Case No. BC525830 Assigned for all purposes to the Hon. Terry A. Green, Dept. 14

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD’S,

LONDON AND CERTAIN LONDON

MARKET INSURANCE COMPANIES,

LONDON MARKET INSURERS’ NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE

PLEADINGS (RE: LONDON MARKET

INSURERS’ COMPLAINT)

Plaintiffs, V.

TRANSAMERICA CORPORATION, (now known as TIG INSURANCE COMPANY) Date: May 8, 2014 Time: 8:45 a.m. Dept.: 14

Defendant.

LONDON AND CERTAIN LONDON TEITL LT

MARKET INSURANCE COMPANIES,Cross-defendants. C’*E t—ff $o =

3888 & LONDON MARKET INSURERS’ MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (LMI* COMPLAINT)

DMIV475114 .4

F3SHDS LI

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CERTAIN LONDON MARKET COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANSAMERICA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TIG INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN SAFETY INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLLINGER, JEFFREY A