Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 16:56:08 (UTC).

CELVIN JUAREZ VS. FEDEX OFFICE AND PRINT SERVICE, INC.,

Case Summary

On 08/23/2013 CELVIN JUAREZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against FEDEX OFFICE AND PRINT SERVICE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9244

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUAREZ CELVIN

Defendants

DOES 1

FEDEX OFFICE AND PRINT SERVICE INC. A TE

SCHIESSEL A. EDWARD TRUSTEE OF THE SCHIE

DOES 1 - 25

SAFCO CAPITAL CORPORATION (DOE 1)

SAFCO CAPITAL CORPORATION DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OSCAR VALENCIA

VALENCIA OSCAR

Defendant Attorney

HIGGS FLETCHER & MACK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CELVIN JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • DocketNotice; Filed by CELVIN JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by CELVIN JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by CELVIN JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by CELVIN JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CELVIN JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by FEDEX OFFICE AND PRINT SERVICE, INC. A TE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by FEDEX OFFICE AND PRINT SERVICE, INC. A TE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by FEDEX OFFICE AND PRINT SERVICE, INC. A TE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FEDEX OFFICE AND PRINT SERVICE, INC. A TE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CELVIN JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAFCO CAPITAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDEX OFFICE AND PRINT SERVICES INC. is a litigant