This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 04:39:17 (UTC).

CELIA ALATORRE VS TARGET CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/19/2011 CELIA ALATORRE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TARGET CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, MARGARET M. BERNAL, YVONNE T. SANCHEZ and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9532

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

MARGARET M. BERNAL

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALATORRE CELIA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

COME LAND MAINTENANCE CO. INC.

COME LAND MAINTENANCE SERVICE CO. INC

TARGET CORPORATION (ERRONEOUSLY SUED)

TARGET STORES

W.L. BUTLER CONSTRUCTION INC

STORES TARGET

TARGET CORPORATION ERRONEOUSLY SUED

RITCHIE KLINKERT & MCCALLION

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

W.L. BUTLER CONSTRUCTION INC

Not Classified By Court

GARMAN JOHN W.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS LAW CORPORATION

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ACQUESTA MARY K. ESQ

FISHER-REYES JENNA L.

HOSP GILBERT BERGSTEIN & HOUGH

PRINDLE AMARO GOETZ HILLYARD ET AL

THOMAS O'HAGAN & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE RE-ASSIGNMEN1

3/22/2013: NOTICE OF CASE RE-ASSIGNMEN1

Minute Order -

4/2/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF EX PARTE AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN UPPORT THEREOF; )ECLARATION OF MUAMMAR ) TEED

4/2/2013: NOTICE OF EX PARTE AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN UPPORT THEREOF; )ECLARATION OF MUAMMAR ) TEED

ORDER

4/2/2013: ORDER

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT & TO EXTENDED ALL DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF MUAMMAR REED

4/26/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT & TO EXTENDED ALL DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF MUAMMAR REED

Proof of Service -

5/7/2013: Proof of Service -

DECLARATION OF MARY ACQUESTA IN SUPPORT OF W.L. BUTLER CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND

5/7/2013: DECLARATION OF MARY ACQUESTA IN SUPPORT OF W.L. BUTLER CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND

W.L. BUTLER CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND/OR PLAINTIFF?S COUNSEL PURSUANT TO CCP ? 1

5/7/2013: W.L. BUTLER CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND/OR PLAINTIFF?S COUNSEL PURSUANT TO CCP ? 1

TARGET STORES? MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF R. DEREK CLASSEN

5/7/2013: TARGET STORES? MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF R. DEREK CLASSEN

W.L. BUTLER CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/7/2013: W.L. BUTLER CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF BRIAN R. WILSON IN SUPPORT OF W.L, BUTLER CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF A

5/7/2013: DECLARATION OF BRIAN R. WILSON IN SUPPORT OF W.L, BUTLER CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF A

DECLARATION OF R. DEREK CLASSEN IN SUPPLEMENT TO TARGET?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/8/2013: DECLARATION OF R. DEREK CLASSEN IN SUPPLEMENT TO TARGET?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT & TO EXTEND ALL DISCOVERY CUT OFF DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF MUAM

5/13/2013: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT & TO EXTEND ALL DISCOVERY CUT OFF DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF MUAM

PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL

5/15/2013: PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL

Minute Order -

5/20/2013: Minute Order -

RULING RE: PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC.

5/20/2013: RULING RE: PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC.

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

5/24/2013: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL OFF CALENDAR

5/28/2013: NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL OFF CALENDAR

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; (Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE action ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CELIA ALATORRE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • DocketNotice (of entry of dismissal and proof of service ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
275 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2011
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by TARGET CORPORATION (ERRONEOUSLY SUED) (Defendant); TARGET STORES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2011
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TARGET STORES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by CELIA ALATORRE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons (AS TO TARGET CORPORATION, A MINNESOTA CORPORATION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CELIA ALATORRE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COME LAND MAINTENANCE SERVICE CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where STORES TARGET is a litigant

Latest cases where W.L. BUTLER CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TARGET STORES is a litigant