Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2020 at 23:20:52 (UTC).

CELESTINO ACOSTA ET AL VS CITY OF LONG BEACH ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/13/2015 CELESTINO ACOSTA filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against CITY OF LONG BEACH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1412

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ACOSTA CELESTINO

AGUILAR SUZANNA

ALBARRAN LUIS

ALBARRAN ROSA ISELA

ALVILLAR ROBERT

ANCTIL JUDITH

DAVIS JAMES

HORTON ROCKY

CAMACHO RAYMOND

PORTILLO FRANCIS

MAZARIEGOS JOSE ROBERTO

CATHEY BILL

TOSCANO SOCORRO

VILLALOBOS ESPERANZA

RUIZ ANTONIO

GIRON ROMEO

GARCIO JIM

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-100

FRIENDLY VILLAGE OF LONG BEACH

LONG BEACH CITY OF

263 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KABATECK BROWN KELLNER LLP

FIELDSLAW

MICHELMAN SANFORD L. ESQ.

FIELDS GARY D.

WOLENSKY GARY A.

PANG NATALIE S.

VANDENBURG THOMAS F.

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

VANDENBURG THOMAS F.

RICHARDS WATSON & GERSHON

COOKSEY TOOLEN GAGE DUFFY & WOOG

RICHARDS WATSON & GERSHON LAW O/O

WOOG PHILIP MICHAEL

RAZZANO JENNIFER E.

LAZORISAK THERESA HELEN

D'ANDREA MICHAEL A JR

STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

CAMHI HOWARD I. ESQ.

SCHLEIER SAMUEL QUINN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

RICHARDS WATSON & GERSHON

COOKSEY TOOLEN GAGE DUFFY & WOOG

RICHARDS WATSON & GERSHON LAW O/O

Other Attorneys

PERKINS COIE LLP

HEROLD ANDREW D

SULLIVAN KATELYN CHRISTINE

 

Court Documents

Request for Judicial Notice - Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Sierra Corporate Management, Inc., Kort & Scott Financial Group, Friendly Villa

4/12/2019: Request for Judicial Notice - Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Sierra Corporate Management, Inc., Kort & Scott Financial Group, Friendly Villa

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHANT A. KARNIKIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SIERRA CORPORATE MANAGEMENT, INC., KORT & SCOTT FINANCIAL GROUP, FRIENDLY VILLAGE MHP ASSOCIATES L.P.

4/12/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHANT A. KARNIKIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SIERRA CORPORATE MANAGEMENT, INC., KORT & SCOTT FINANCIAL GROUP, FRIENDLY VILLAGE MHP ASSOCIATES L.P.

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: SUBSTITUTION PARTIES AND AMENDING COMPLAINTS

7/23/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: SUBSTITUTION PARTIES AND AMENDING COMPLAINTS

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF JULY 31, 2019

8/1/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF JULY 31, 2019

Request for Dismissal

3/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Other - - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND PLAINTIFFS' JULY 6, 2017 NOTICE IDENTIFYING MEDICAL TREATMENT CLAIMANTS

9/10/2018: Other - - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND PLAINTIFFS' JULY 6, 2017 NOTICE IDENTIFYING MEDICAL TREATMENT CLAIMANTS

Other - - PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF PARTIAL NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO.29 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY RE: COST OF REPAIR METHODOLOGY

9/10/2018: Other - - PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF PARTIAL NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO.29 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY RE: COST OF REPAIR METHODOLOGY

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00

9/17/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00

Minute Order - (Jury Trial)

10/15/2018: Minute Order - (Jury Trial)

Supplemental Declaration - Supplemental Declaration of Matthew R. Pahl in support of Motion for (1) Cooksey, Toolen, Gage, Duffy & Woog to be relieved as Counsel, and (2) immediate stay of proceedings

10/25/2018: Supplemental Declaration - Supplemental Declaration of Matthew R. Pahl in support of Motion for (1) Cooksey, Toolen, Gage, Duffy & Woog to be relieved as Counsel, and (2) immediate stay of proceedings

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

11/2/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Jury Instructions

11/13/2018: Jury Instructions

Response - Response to jury question #2

11/13/2018: Response - Response to jury question #2

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

11/15/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PHIL WOOG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS RE: ROBERT MCKINNEY AND DEBORAH MCKINNEY

6/21/2018: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PHIL WOOG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS RE: ROBERT MCKINNEY AND DEBORAH MCKINNEY

Other - - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO.17

8/10/2018: Other - - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO.17

Other - - -POSTING TO THE MESSAGE BOARD: Message Title: RE: Request for Informal Discovery Conference

11/28/2017: Other - - -POSTING TO THE MESSAGE BOARD: Message Title: RE: Request for Informal Discovery Conference

Notice - -NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

12/8/2017: Notice - -NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

691 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • Docketat 4:30 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (reFinal Dismissal of Case and Request to Vacate Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Celestino Acosta (Plaintiff); MAYORGA, RODRIGO ACOSTA (Plaintiff); Suzanna Aguilar (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketAppellate Order Extending Time for Reporter Transcript Prep (NOA: 06/12/19 B298305); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAbandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145 ("R")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAbandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145 ("R1")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAbandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145; Filed by FRIENDLY VILLAGE MOBILE ASSOCIATES, LP (Appellant); FRIENDLY VILLAGE GP, LLC DOE 1 (Appellant); FRIENDLY VILLAGE MOBILE HOME ASSOC DOE 2 (Appellant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAbandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145 ("R2")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Clerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal (NOA: 06/12/19-R B298305); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Clerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal (NOA: 06/12/19 B298305); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Clerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal (NOA: 06/12/19-R B298305); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1,285 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketNotice; Filed by CITY OF LONG BEACH (Defendant); Long Beach, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Celestino Acosta (Plaintiff); Suzanna Aguilar (Plaintiff); Luis Albarran (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Celestino Acosta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 310; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-08-27 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO MAINTAIN MOBILEHOME PARK; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rodrigo Acosta Gomez (Plaintiff); Celestino Acosta (Plaintiff); MAYORGA, RODRIGO ACOSTA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEROLD ANDREW D. ESQ.