This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2019 at 16:23:06 (UTC).

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER VS HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK INC

Case Summary

On 11/20/2015 CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1961

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Defendants and Respondents

BAKERSFIELD FAMILY MEDICAL GROUP INC.

DESERT MEDICAL GROUP INC.

DOES 1 TO 100

HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK INC.

HIGH DESERT MEDICAL CORPORATION A

LAKESIDE MEDICAL GROUP INC.

OASIS INDEPENDENT MEDICAL ASSOCIATES INC

REGAL MEDICAL GROUP INC.

SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HOOPER LUNDY & BOOKMAN P.C.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

AMIR MICHAEL M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BOOK ACCOUNT; ETC

11/20/2015: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BOOK ACCOUNT; ETC

SUMMONS

11/20/2015: SUMMONS

ORIGINAL PROOFS OF SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

12/8/2015: ORIGINAL PROOFS OF SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

1/15/2016: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/27/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER

2/5/2016: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER

Unknown

2/8/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/10/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/16/2016: DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Unknown

2/18/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

2/19/2016: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

TENTATIVE RULING

2/23/2016: TENTATIVE RULING

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK, INC., REGAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC., LAKESIDE MEDICAL GROUP, INC., OASIS INDEPENDENT MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC., DESERT MEDICAL GROUP, INC., HIGH DESERT MEDIC

3/14/2016: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK, INC., REGAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC., LAKESIDE MEDICAL GROUP, INC., OASIS INDEPENDENT MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, INC., DESERT MEDICAL GROUP, INC., HIGH DESERT MEDIC

Minute Order

5/4/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/22/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF POST INFORMAL MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

6/22/2016: NOTICE OF POST INFORMAL MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order

12/5/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/9/2017: Minute Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17; (Order to Show Cause; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17; Status Conference (Status Conference; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Demurrer; Filed by Heritage Provider Network, Inc. (Defendant); Regal Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant); Lakeside Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DECLARATION OF AMY I. BORLUND PURSUANT TO CCP 430.41 RE MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS PRIOR TO DEFENDANTS' FILING OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by Heritage Provider Network, Inc. (Defendant); Regal Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant); Lakeside Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • ORIGINAL PROOFS OF SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BOOK ACCOUNT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OASIS INDEPENDENT MEDICAL ASSOCIATES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Desert Medical Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Sierra Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lakeside Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant