This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2017 at 14:02:46 (UTC).

CECILIO MILIAN, ET AL. VS. JAMES DALLAS MCVIE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/12/2012 CECILIO MILIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JAMES DALLAS MCVIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and LAURA C. ELLISON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7256

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

LAURA C. ELLISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ JHOANA

TEJEDA ROCIO

LEON CARLOS

JOSE DORA

PEREZ DIVINA

CERVANTES ANDRES

LOPEZ CARMEN

MILIAN CECILIO

RAMOS GLADIS

SALAS YOSIEL

FELIX SOIBER

SALAS JUANA

LOPEZ EVELIN

RAMOS MARIO

RAMOS CLAUDIA

SANTOS JOSE

FIGUEROA MARIA ESTHER

LOPEZ SUSANA

Defendants

MCVIE JAMES DALLAS

DOES 1-50

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANDRA GEHRI SPENCER A PROF. LAW CORP.

Defendant Attorney

MANNING MARDER KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/21/2013: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/29/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/1/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (w/prej entire action ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO PLNTF RUBEN DE DIOS *ONLY* ) Filed by Plaintiff/Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • Receipt - General (CIVIL DEPOSIT - JURY FEES POSTED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • Receipt - General (CIVIL DEPOSIT-JURY FEES POSTED ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed (ANSWERING PARTY: JAMES DALLAS MCVIE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLTFS. FIFT CAUSE OF ACTION OF COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • Reply (IN SUPOORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTFS. COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Opposition (TO MOTION TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • Demurrer (TO PLTFS. 5TH CAUSE FO ACTION OF COMPLT. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF PLTFS. COMPLT. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less