This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 01:58:48 (UTC).

CECELIA GONZALEZ VS. CITY OF LOMITA

Case Summary

On 04/09/2012 CECELIA GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOMITA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, GREGORY KEOSIAN, DUDLEY W. GRAY II and REFERENCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6866

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

DUDLEY W. GRAY II

REFERENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ CECELIA

Defendants

CITY OF LOMITA

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Not Classified By Court

COLEMAN KATHARINE R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2012: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/9/2012: Notice of Case Management Conference

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OSC-RE OTHER (MISCELLANEOUS)

4/16/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OSC-RE OTHER (MISCELLANEOUS)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-06-29 00:00:00

6/29/2012: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-06-29 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-09-14 00:00:00

9/14/2012: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-09-14 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO COMPEL

11/26/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO COMPEL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

12/10/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE-ASSIGNMENT-MEDTR-AMENDED

12/14/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE-ASSIGNMENT-MEDTR-AMENDED

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

3/21/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE-MEDIATION HEARING DATE

3/25/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE-MEDIATION HEARING DATE

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/2/2013: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order -

7/3/2013: Minute Order -

DEFENDANT?S NOTICE F MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO AND ETC

8/26/2013: DEFENDANT?S NOTICE F MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO AND ETC

DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO AND ETC

8/26/2013: DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO AND ETC

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED PLAINTIFF CECILIA GONZALEZ?S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ETC

8/26/2013: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED PLAINTIFF CECILIA GONZALEZ?S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ETC

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

9/12/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order -

9/26/2013: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

3/12/2014: Minute Order -

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketCase Document - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; (Osc Re Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department LA91, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Osc Re Dismissal - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2014-03-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2013-11-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2013-11-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 91; (Motion - Compel Responses; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2012
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2012-06-29 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CECELIA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by CECELIA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by CECELIA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CECELIA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less