Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2016 at 09:04:25 (UTC).

CDS NETWORKS INC VS. GEORGIA PEILA

Case Summary

On 06/11/2013 CDS NETWORKS INC filed an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit against GEORGIA PEILA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7163

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CDS NETWORKS INC. AND OREGON CORPORATION

Defendants

PEILA GEORGIA

CENICEROS GEORGIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MANCUSO ESQ. NICHOLAS S.

BERNTSEN STEPHANIE P. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT ISSUED AND FILED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Appl for Entry-Sister State Judgmt Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Sister State Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: KS017163    Hearing Date: October 05, 2020    Dept: O

Plaintiff’s counsel, Stephanie Berntsen’s motion to be relieved as counsel is GRANTED. The order shall take effect when the proof of service of a copy of the signed order on the client is filed with the Court.

Good cause exists to grant the motion based on any of the grounds under Rules of Professional Conduct Rule 3-700(c). Rule 3-700(c) provides that an attorney may withdraw based on any of the following:

(1) The client (a) insists upon presenting a claim or defense that is not warranted under existing law and cannot be supported by good faith argument for an extension, modification, or reversal of existing law, or (b) seeks to pursue an illegal course of conduct, or (c) insists that the member pursue a course of conduct that is illegal or that is prohibited under these rules or the State Bar Act, or (d) by other conduct renders it unreasonably difficult for the member to carry out the employment effectively, or (e) insists, in a matter not pending before a tribunal, that the member engage in conduct that is contrary to the judgment and advice of the member but not prohibited under these rules or the State Bar Act, or (f) breaches an agreement or obligation to the member as to expenses or fees.

(2) The continued employment is likely to result in a violation of these rules or of the State Bar Act; or

(3) The inability to work with co-counsel indicates that the best interests of the client likely will be served by withdrawal; or

(4) The member's mental or physical condition renders it difficult for the member to carry out the employment effectively; or

(5) The client knowingly and freely assents to termination of the employment; or

(6) The member believes in good faith, in a proceeding pending before a tribunal, that the tribunal will find the existence of other good cause for withdrawal.

The attorney declaration demonstrates good cause for withdrawal based on a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship and breakdown in communication with the clients. The client, Plaintiff CDS Networks, Inc. and its representative John C. Tooker, was served by mail. The motion is GRANTED. The order shall take effect when the proof of service of a copy of the signed order on the client is filed with the Court.