Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 22:57:14 (UTC).

CATALINA FRANCO VS RIKI OSHIMA

Case Summary

On 08/17/2015 CATALINA FRANCO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RIKI OSHIMA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1662

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FRANCO CATALINE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-100

OSHIMA RIKI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CHUDACOFF SIMON CHERIN & FRIEDMAN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

8/17/2015: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

8/17/2015: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/10/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/1/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Cataline Franco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Cataline Franco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less