This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2021 at 17:18:40 (UTC).

CASSANDRA MASON VS YAMASHIRO INC

Case Summary

On 03/23/2012 CASSANDRA MASON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against YAMASHIRO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1494

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MASON CASSANDRA

Defendant

YAMASHIRO INC.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

5/21/2012: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

5/3/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

3/23/2012: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

SUMMONS -

3/23/2012: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/23/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

3/23/2012: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 58; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cassandra Mason (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less