Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2021 at 11:11:44 (UTC).

CARRIE LAMBERT VS DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/06/2016 CARRIE LAMBERT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIHU M. BERLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6149

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIHU M. BERLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LAMBERT CARRIE

Defendants and Respondents

ATHENA HEALTHCARE INC.

DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER INC.

SHREYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA INC.

SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA INC.

SHARMA TONMOY

ADEONA HEALTHCARE INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

SOVEREIGN ASSET MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MATERN MATTHEW J. ESQ.

MATERN MATTHEW JOHN ESQ.

RODRIGUEZ VANESSA MARIE

KHALILI DALIA ROYA

GORDON MATTHEW WARREN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

AHEARN CHRISTOPHER M.

FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

AHEARN CHRISTOPHER M

SCHERWIN TODD BRIAN

BROWN THOMAS P. IV

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CONFERENCE (INFORMAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE RE: TRIAL))

1/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CONFERENCE (INFORMAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE RE: TRIAL))

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE; STATUS CONFERENCE

10/22/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE; STATUS CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

9/28/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE SANDRA GUERRA, CSR NO. 10977

7/17/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE SANDRA GUERRA, CSR NO. 10977

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS)

6/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE VIENNA NGUYEN, CSR# 13137

3/16/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE VIENNA NGUYEN, CSR# 13137

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFEN...)

3/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFEN...)

Motion for Terminating Sanctions - MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT TONMOY SHARMA

7/3/2019: Motion for Terminating Sanctions - MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT TONMOY SHARMA

Other - - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

4/25/2018: Other - - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

Other - - ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

5/1/2018: Other - - ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

Other - - PLAINTIFF CARRIE LAMBERT S STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

6/1/2018: Other - - PLAINTIFF CARRIE LAMBERT S STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

Minute Order -

6/6/2018: Minute Order -

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

10/9/2018: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/14/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTES ENTERED 10/20/16 COUNTY CLERK

10/20/2016: Minute Order - MINUTES ENTERED 10/20/16 COUNTY CLERK

Minute Order -

3/1/2017: Minute Order -

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • Hearing08/09/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Conference ((Informal Scheduling Conference ReTrial)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Conference (Informal Scheduling Conference Re: Trial))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions of $100.00 Against Defense Counsel for Failure to Appear at the Further Status Conference on 10/20/2020) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions of $100.00 Against Defense ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Vienna Nguyen, CSR# 13137); Filed by Carrie Lambert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling Re; Status conference; Filed by Carrie Lambert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
265 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carrie Lambert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carrie Lambert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carrie Lambert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carrie Lambert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carrie Lambert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carrie Lambert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Carrie Lambert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carrie Lambert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE REQUIRED MEAL PERIODS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATHENA HEALTHCARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SHREYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOVEREING ASSET MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation is a litigant