This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 15:07:23 (UTC).

CARRASCO, PATRICIA VS AHLERS, CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 11/01/2016 CARRASCO, PATRICIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AHLERS, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3794

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARRASCO PATRICIA

Respondent

AHLERS CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KRAFT MARCIA L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Carrasco, Patricia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Carrasco, Patricia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Carrasco, Patricia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 01-12-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Carrasco, Patricia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 11-17-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Carrasco, Patricia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Carrasco, Patricia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.