Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2019 at 01:13:35 (UTC).

CAROLYN OLSEN VS BRANDT A HANDLEY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2009 CAROLYN OLSEN filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against BRANDT A HANDLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HELEN I. BENDIX. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0825

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HELEN I. BENDIX

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLSEN CAROLYN

Defendant

HANDLEY BRANDT A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF PAUL H. SAMUELS P.C.

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

1/5/2018: APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

1/5/2018: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEY-ICLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

5/26/2009: PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEY-ICLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

PROOF OF SERVICE COURT TYPE

8/14/2009: PROOF OF SERVICE COURT TYPE

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

10/9/2009: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

11/20/2009: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

Minute Order

12/3/2009: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

12/4/2009: NOTICE OF RULING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

12/24/2009: JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

Minute Order

12/29/2009: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

1/15/2010: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

8/20/2010: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1/17/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2018
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Renewal of Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Carolyn Olsen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2009
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 18; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2009
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2009
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Carolyn Olsen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by Carolyn Olsen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Carolyn Olsen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE COURT TYPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2009
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2009
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM ATTORNEY-ICLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BS120825    Hearing Date: October 20, 2020    Dept: 49

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Carolyn Olsen,

Petitioner,

Case No.

BS120825

v.

[Tentative] Ruling

Brandt A. Handley,

Respondent.

Hearing Date: October 20, 2020

Department 49, Judge Stuart M. Rice

(1) Claim of Exemption

Moving Party:  Judgment Debtor Brandt Handley, individually and on behalf of Third-Party Resource Options International, Inc. (ROI)

Responding Party:      Judgment Creditor Carolyn Olsen

Ruling: The claim of exemption is denied.

Therefore, the claim of exemption is denied. Although Olsen discusses section 704.080 of the Code of Civil Procedure, that section was not a basis for Handley/ROI’s claim of exemption and need not be addressed for the court to reach its ruling. Olsen is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Date: October 20, 2020

Honorable Stuart M. Rice

Judge of the Superior Court