This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2019 at 13:44:05 (UTC).

CAROLYN HERMANNS VS ONYX THERAPEUTICS, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/17/2015 CAROLYN HERMANNS filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ONYX THERAPEUTICS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE and MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9135

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HERMANNS CAROLYN

HERMANNS CAROLYN AS EXECUTRIX OF THE

Defendants and Respondents

BERENSON JAMES R. M.D.

DOES 1 TO 10

JAMES R. BERENSON M.D. INC.

JOHN/JANE DOES 1 TO 10

ONYX THERPEUTICS INC.

BERENSON M.D. JAMES R

ONYX THERAPEUTICS INC.

JOHN/JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SHERMAN SILVERSTEIN KOHL ROSE

ZEMAN ROBERT A.

SHERMAN SILVERSTEIN KOHL ROSE &

MILSTEIN ALAN C.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARFORD STOCKAPLER

SKAAR DAVID W.

HOGAN LOVELLS LLP

REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARFORD

HOGAN & LOVELLS US LLP

TANSEY JAMES N.

LOVELLS HOGAN

COLTON LAUREN SCHULTZ

 

Court Documents

RULING RE: APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE

8/13/2015: RULING RE: APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DE[VIURRER OF DEFIU4DANTS, JAMES R BERENSON, M.D. AND JAMES R. BERENSON, M.D., INC., TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDEI) COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

8/7/2015: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DE[VIURRER OF DEFIU4DANTS, JAMES R BERENSON, M.D. AND JAMES R. BERENSON, M.D., INC., TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDEI) COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

6/17/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

4/17/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO ADMIT PRO HAC VICE [FAX FILING]

4/28/2015: NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO ADMIT PRO HAC VICE [FAX FILING]

DEFENDANT ONYX THERAPEUTICS, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIEST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.

8/13/2015: DEFENDANT ONYX THERAPEUTICS, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIEST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS, JAMES K. BERENSON, IVED. ANT) JAMES R. BERENSON, M.D., INC., TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

6/18/2015: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS, JAMES K. BERENSON, IVED. ANT) JAMES R. BERENSON, M.D., INC., TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

6/19/2015: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Minute Order

8/13/2015: Minute Order

SUMMONS

4/17/2015: SUMMONS

DEFENDANTS, JAMES R. BERENSON, M.D. AND JAMES R. BERENSON, M.D., INC.,'S REPLY BRIEF TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

4/27/2016: DEFENDANTS, JAMES R. BERENSON, M.D. AND JAMES R. BERENSON, M.D., INC.,'S REPLY BRIEF TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

4/27/2016: DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

9/9/2015: STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, OR WRONGFUL DEATH

8/1/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, OR WRONGFUL DEATH

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES [FAX FILE] DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/14/2015: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES [FAX FILE] DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Unknown

6/18/2015: Unknown

DEFENDANT ONYX THERAPEUTICS, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

6/17/2015: DEFENDANT ONYX THERAPEUTICS, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

ORDER DENYING APPLICATION PRO HAC VICE

5/21/2015: ORDER DENYING APPLICATION PRO HAC VICE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEO, Lisa Hart Cole, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) (RE PRO HAC VICE STATUS AS TOLAUREN SCHULTZ COLTON, ESQ.(RE ANNUAL RENEWAL FEE PERGOVERNMENT CODE 70617(e)(2)) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Onyx Therapeutics, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; (Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEO, Lisa Hart Cole, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE: DISMISSAL(partial dismissals entered as toberenson and onyx)) - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department O; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • at 09:30 am in Department WEO, Lisa Hart Cole, Presiding; Jury Trial ((7-10 DAYS)) - Advanced to this date & Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department O; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • at 09:30 am in Department WEO, Lisa Hart Cole, Presiding; Final Status Conference ((JT 01/16/18)) - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2015
  • Demurrer; Filed by Onyx Therpeutics, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • ORDER DENYING APPLICATION PRO HAC VICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Order; Filed by Hermanns, Carolyn, as Executrix of the (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO ADMIT PRO HAC VICE [FAX FILING]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Carolyn Hermanns (Plaintiff); Hermanns, Carolyn, as Executrix of the (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.