This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 15:35:57 (UTC).

CAROL STRICKLAND VS. MIRACLE MARKET & LIQUOR

Case Summary

On 12/20/2012 CAROL STRICKLAND filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MIRACLE MARKET LIQUOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, GREGORY KEOSIAN, DAVID SOTELO and WILLIAM BARRY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7163

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

DAVID SOTELO

WILLIAM BARRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRICKLAND CAROL

Defendants

J.K. PARK CORP

MIRACLE MARKET

Not Classified By Court

MIRACLE MARKET & LIQUOR

Others

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

WUCETICH PETER M. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JARED GROSS

Defendant Attorney

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER

 

Court Documents

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/28/2015: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ISSUE OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

10/29/2015: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ISSUE OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY WITNESS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT RE: MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD PARTY WITNESS SCHIFRIN, GAGNON & DICKEY

9/23/2015: DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY WITNESS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT RE: MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD PARTY WITNESS SCHIFRIN, GAGNON & DICKEY

ADDENDUM RE: DECLARATION OF BOB MALHAM IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD PARTY WITNESS ETC.

9/24/2015: ADDENDUM RE: DECLARATION OF BOB MALHAM IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD PARTY WITNESS ETC.

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

2/11/2015: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF COURT ORDER CONTINUING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES

10/21/2014: NOTICE OF COURT ORDER CONTINUING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS (DEPARTNIENT 91 92, 93, 97)

10/2/2015: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS (DEPARTNIENT 91 92, 93, 97)

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/9/2015: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

1/8/2015: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

DECLARATION OF VALERIE JACKSON IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD PARTY WITNESS SCHIFRIN, GAGNON & DICKEY, INC.

9/23/2015: DECLARATION OF VALERIE JACKSON IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD PARTY WITNESS SCHIFRIN, GAGNON & DICKEY, INC.

DECLARATION OF ROBERT M. ANDERSON IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD PARTY WITNESS SCHIFRIN, GAGNON & DICKEY, INC.

9/23/2015: DECLARATION OF ROBERT M. ANDERSON IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD PARTY WITNESS SCHIFRIN, GAGNON & DICKEY, INC.

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD PARTY WITNESS SCHIFRIN, GAGNON & DICKEY, INC. PURSUANT TO DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RE

7/7/2015: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD PARTY WITNESS SCHIFRIN, GAGNON & DICKEY, INC. PURSUANT TO DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RE

DECLARATION OF JARED GROSS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ISSUE OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

8/20/2015: DECLARATION OF JARED GROSS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ISSUE OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

DECLARATION OF CAROL STRICKLAND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/9/2015: DECLARATION OF CAROL STRICKLAND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF JARED GROSS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/9/2015: DECLARATION OF JARED GROSS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ISSUE OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS FOR DESTRUCTION OF EVIDENCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES TN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/20/2015: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ISSUE OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS FOR DESTRUCTION OF EVIDENCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES TN SUPPORT THEREOF

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUING TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES

1/27/2015: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUING TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES

DECLARATION OF MARTIN K. DENISTON IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD PARTY WITNESS SCHIFRIN, GAGNON & DICKEY, INC.

9/23/2015: DECLARATION OF MARTIN K. DENISTON IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM THIRD PARTY WITNESS SCHIFRIN, GAGNON & DICKEY, INC.

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2015
  • Request for Dismissal ( ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • OSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Response (TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MSJ; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Points and Authorities (MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MIRACLE MARKET'S MSJ; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Declaration (OF JARED GROSS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MSJ; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • Reply to Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ISSUE OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • Objection Document Filed (TO DECLARATION OF JARED GROSS FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ISSUE OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • Supplemental Declaration (OF ROBERT M. ANDERSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ISSUE OR TERMINATING SANCTIONS; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2013
  • Notice (OF TAKING DEMURRER & MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR 3/19/13 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • Demurrer (TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF PLNTFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • Memorandum - Other (OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLNTFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.