This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 19:23:10 (UTC).

CARLOS SPERANZA VS MARQUISE INC

Case Summary

On 06/19/2015 CARLOS SPERANZA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MARQUISE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL FEUER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5726

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GAIL FEUER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SPERANZA CARLOS

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

MARQUISE INC.

SERVPRO OF HOLLYWOOD HILLS/LOS FELIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MYERS LAW GROUP A.P.C. THE

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

OLAH FRANK C.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

6/19/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. UNPAID WAGES; ETC

6/19/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. UNPAID WAGES; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/24/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE

7/13/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

8/7/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

10/2/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

10/6/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

10/19/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

10/19/2015: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF MEROUJAN KITSINIAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE

2/18/2016: DECLARATION OF MEROUJAN KITSINIAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE

NOTICE AND EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION; ETC.

2/18/2016: NOTICE AND EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION; ETC.

DECLARATION OF FRANK C. OLAH IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE

2/18/2016: DECLARATION OF FRANK C. OLAH IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE

ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE

2/18/2016: ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE

Proof of Service

2/18/2016: Proof of Service

Minute Order

2/18/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER

2/22/2016: NOTICE OF ORDER

Minute Order

2/26/2016: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/13/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2016
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 78; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 78; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 78; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 78; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 23; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2015
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Marquise, Inc. (Defendant); Servpro of Hollywood Hills/Los Feliz (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DEFENDANT MARQUISE, INC. DBA SERVPRO OF HOLLYWOOD HIILLS/LOS FELIZ'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Carlos Speranza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. UNPAID WAGES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVPRO OF HOLLYWOOD HILLS/LOS FELIZ is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OLAH FRANK C.