Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 15:16:12 (UTC).

CARLOS PUEBLA VS LEGEND REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC

Case Summary

On 08/03/2012 CARLOS PUEBLA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LEGEND REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, ELIA WEINBACH and YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1666

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

ELIA WEINBACH

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PUEBLA CARLOS

Defendants and Cross Defendants

RIVERSIDE JANITORIAL DOE COMPANY II

LEGEND REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC

SPECTRUM STRIPING SERVIVE DOE COMPANY 1

SPECTRUM STRIPING SERVICES INC.

CALMEX MAINTENANCE INC. ROE 1

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LEGEND REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIXON & DALEY LLP

Defendant Attorneys

EARLY MASLACH & HARTSUYKER

YOKA & SMITH

MUHAR GEORGE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/11/2013: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

4/22/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: CROSS-COMPLAINT - SPECTRUM STRIPING SERVICES

5/22/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: CROSS-COMPLAINT - SPECTRUM STRIPING SERVICES

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/31/2013: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: CROSSCOMPLAINT RIVERSIDE JANITORIAL SERVICES

6/17/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: CROSSCOMPLAINT RIVERSIDE JANITORIAL SERVICES

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/7/2013: AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

8/22/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: CROSSCOMPLAINT - CALMEX MAINTENANCE, INC.

9/3/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: CROSSCOMPLAINT - CALMEX MAINTENANCE, INC.

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

10/15/2013: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

Minute Order -

10/15/2013: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

10/16/2013: Minute Order -

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CALMEX MAINTENANCE, INC. FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, IMPLIED INDEMNITY, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT, AND EQUITABLE INDEMNITY

10/21/2013: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CALMEX MAINTENANCE, INC. FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, IMPLIED INDEMNITY, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT, AND EQUITABLE INDEMNITY

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/21/2013: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

ANSWER OF CALMEX MAINTENANCE, INC. TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

11/4/2013: ANSWER OF CALMEX MAINTENANCE, INC. TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

12/11/2013: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF PI SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM & ORDER

7/28/2014: NOTICE OF PI SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM & ORDER

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

8/15/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

10/23/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal With Prejudice; Filed by SPECTRUM STRIPING SERVICES, INC. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal With Prejudice; Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CARLOS PUEBLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal With Prejudice; Filed by Calmex Maintenance Inc. Roe 1 (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal With Prejudice; Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (entire action w/prej ); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO LEGEND REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by CARLOS PUEBLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Docketat 01:30 pm in Department F, YVONNE T. SANCHEZ, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Matter heard, matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGEND REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT is a litigant