Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2020 at 07:12:12 (UTC).

CARLOS PARRA ET AL VS GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/20/2010 CARLOS PARRA filed an Other lawsuit against GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY W. ALARCON and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4080

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY W. ALARCON

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PARRA CARLOS

PARRA ESMERALDA

Defendants and Respondents

3M COMPANY

CBS CORPORATION

DK AMANS VALVE

DK VALVE & SUPPLY INC

EQUILON ENTERPRISES LLC

FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY OF L.A.

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC.

INDUSTRIAL CLUTCH & BRAKE INC.

IRWIN INDUSTRIES INC

J.T. THORPE INC.

LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

MACARTHUR COMPANY

METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

SHELL OIL COMPANY

TESORO CORPORATION

TESORO PETROLEUM CORPORATION

TEXACO INC.

TIMEC COMPANY INC

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRAYTON ALAN R. ESQ.

DONADIO DAVID R. ESQ.

SLONIKER GEOFFREY TERRANCE ESQ.

BRAYTON ALAN RICHARD

Defendant Attorneys

BECHERER KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

DOUMANIAN NANCY P. ESQ.

FRASER JAMES D. ESQ

GOETZ ANDY J. ESQ.

MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

MIKACICH AMEE A. ESQ.

NIXON PEABODY LLP

OBERG LISA L. ESQ.

OGDIE SUSAN A.

PEACOCK ALBERT E. ESQ.

POND FRANK D. ESQ.

VASQUEZ ESTRADA & DUMONT LLP

ZACHER GERHARDT P.

BRUNI CHRISTOPHER B. ESQ.

FILICE BROWN EASSA & MCLEOD LLP

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/14/2011: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

6/2/2011: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

6/14/2011: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

8/11/2011: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT TRANSFER

10/26/2011: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT TRANSFER

Proof of Service -

10/27/2011: Proof of Service -

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR LIEN; REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE; REQUEST FOR COPIES OF PLEADINGS

1/30/2012: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR LIEN; REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE; REQUEST FOR COPIES OF PLEADINGS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

    Read MoreRead Less
341 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2010
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Metalclad Insulation Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Timec Company, Inc. DISMISSED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Viacom, Inc. DISMISSED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Irwin Industries, Inc DISMISSED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lamons Gasket Company DISMISSED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DK Valve & Supply, Inc DISMISSED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by INDUSTRIAL CLUTCH & BRAKE, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Equilon Enterprises,LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Industrial Clutch and Brake, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MACARTHUR COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FRICTION MATERIALS, INC. is a litigant