This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2015 at 23:16:29 (UTC).

CARLOS H DE PAZ ET AL VS ADRIANA VENEGAS ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 CARLOS H DE PAZ filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against ADRIANA VENEGAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PAUL GUTMAN, AMY D. HOGUE and ADR NEUTRAL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6853

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PAUL GUTMAN

AMY D. HOGUE

ADR NEUTRAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DE PAZ CARLOS H.

DE PAZ XOCHILT

Defendants

ACEVEDO GABINO

COLLAZO IVAN

DOES 1 - 200

HARTMAN LARRY LEE

VENEGAS & ASSOCIATES INC.

VENEGAS ADRIANA

VENEGAS ENTERPRISES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLORES ALDO A. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BERGKVIST MICHAEL C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/3/2009: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED AGAINST ADRIANA VENEGAS, ETC.

1/23/2009: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED AGAINST ADRIANA VENEGAS, ETC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/13/2010: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

9/9/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/4/2009: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

PLAINTIFFS WITNESS LIST

5/3/2010: PLAINTIFFS WITNESS LIST

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/17/2008: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL

1/27/2009: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/28/2010: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

8/17/2009: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/4/2009: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, ETC.

1/23/2009: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, ETC.

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/4/2009: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF NEW TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/24/2010: NOTICE OF NEW TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

12/23/2008: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

2/11/2010: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

DECLARATION OF ALDO A. FLORES RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/23/2010: DECLARATION OF ALDO A. FLORES RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

5/12/2009: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2015
  • paper file imaged and destroyed Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • List of Witnesses Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • List of Exhibits Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • Brief Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO ADRIANA VENEGAS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • Notice (OF NEW TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • Declaration Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2010
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • Notice of Conference Date Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2009
  • Notice of Motion (MOT/DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED AGAINST IVAN COLLAZO; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • Notice of Motion (MOT/DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED AGAINST GABINO ACEVEDO; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2008
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2008
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.