Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2016 at 01:04:31 (UTC).

CARLOS DOMINGUEZ VS ALICIA DOMINGUEZ

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 CARLOS DOMINGUEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALICIA DOMINGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7169

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOMINGUEZ CARLOS

Respondent

DOMINGUEZ ALICIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2013
  • Judgment-Package Received-2336 Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • Judgment-Package Received-2336 Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • Agreement-Conciliation Crt-& Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Request-Enter Default Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • Miscellaneous (Court ordered refund of respondent 1st app. fees. ) Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • Proof of Service-Mail Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Petition-Dissolution Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less