This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2017 at 22:08:20 (UTC).

CARLOS ALVARADO ET AL VS ROYAL CAR WASH LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/26/2016 CARLOS ALVARADO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ROYAL CAR WASH LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT L. HESS and RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8442

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT L. HESS

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ARGUETA NELSON

SANTOS CORRADO

ALVARADO CARLOS

ALTAMIRANO VICTOR

MARTINEZ JOSE LUIS BRUNO

SANCHEZ HARACELI

GONZALEZ FRANCISCO LOPEZ

GUTIERREZ SALVADOR

JAINTO ANTONIO

ERNESTO MIGUEL

GONZALEZ-LUNA ARTURO

MENDOSA ARMANDO

ALEMAN JOSE

VASQUEZ JUSTINO

ALVARADO FRANCISCO

Defendants and Respondents

YAMIN ALBERT

ROYAL CAR WASH LLC

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

YAMIN KAMAL

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MOON KANE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

4/26/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATIONS - FAILURE TO PAY WAGES AND OVERTIME COMPENSATION; ETC

4/26/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATIONS - FAILURE TO PAY WAGES AND OVERTIME COMPENSATION; ETC

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE OF JUDICIAL OFFICER

4/29/2016: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE OF JUDICIAL OFFICER

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/2/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/3/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/3/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/6/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

5/12/2016: Minute Order

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATIONS - FAILURE TO PAY WAGES AND OVERTIME COMPENSATION; ETC

7/6/2016: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WAGE AND HOUR VIOLATIONS - FAILURE TO PAY WAGES AND OVERTIME COMPENSATION; ETC

Unknown

7/15/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/27/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

9/20/2016: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Minute Order

9/21/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF HEARING

9/27/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

Minute Order

10/24/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/24/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/7/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

12/7/2016: Minute Order

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2016
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE AND AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Notice of Hearing Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Notice of Hearing Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Notice of Hearing Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Notice of Hearing Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less