This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 18:00:15 (UTC).

CARLOS ALBERTO INZUNZA VS EL POTRERO CLUB, SHYR-JIN TSAY ETC

Case Summary

On 08/29/2016 CARLOS ALBERTO INZUNZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EL POTRERO CLUB, SHYR-JIN TSAY ETC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2069

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INZUNZA CARLOS ALBERTO

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PATATA INVESTMENT LLC

TSAY SHYR-JIN

PLATON ANDY

POTRERO CLUB EL

SHYR-JIN TSAY

DOES 1-25

POTRERO INC. DBA EL POTRERO CLUB

EL POTRERO CLUB

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PLATON ANDY

CHRIS BERRELLEZ AN

TACTICAL SECURITY FIRM INC A CA CORP

BERRELLEZ CHRIS

HECTOR BERRELLEZ AN INDIV

BERRELLEZ HECTOR

CHRIS BERRELLEZ AN INDIVID

10-4 PATROL SERVICES

MOES 1-10

10-4 PATROL SERVICES A CA CORP

TACTICAL SECURITY FIRM INC.

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRIGHT TIM LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MURTAUGH MEYER NELSON & TREGLIA LLP

LAW OFFICE OF JILLISA L. O'BRIEN P.C.

 

Court Documents

CoverSheet -

8/29/2016: CoverSheet -

Complaint -

8/29/2016: Complaint -

Summons -

8/29/2016: Summons -

ANSWER OF POTRERO, INC. DBA EL POTRERO CLUB (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS EL POTRERO CLUB), PATATA INVESTMENT, LLC AND SHYR-JIN TSAY TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

11/16/2016: ANSWER OF POTRERO, INC. DBA EL POTRERO CLUB (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS EL POTRERO CLUB), PATATA INVESTMENT, LLC AND SHYR-JIN TSAY TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Summons on Cross Complaint -

11/16/2016: Summons on Cross Complaint -

POTRERO, INC. DBA EL POTRERO CLUB; SHYR-JIN TSAY; AND PATATA IN VESTMENT, LLC?S CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/16/2016: POTRERO, INC. DBA EL POTRERO CLUB; SHYR-JIN TSAY; AND PATATA IN VESTMENT, LLC?S CROSS-COMPLAINT

STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS SHYR-JIN TSAY; ETC.

12/5/2016: STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS SHYR-JIN TSAY; ETC.

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

2/9/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER FOR THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF INCARCERATED DEFENDANT ANDY PLATON PER CC.P. ? 1995 - 1997; DECLARATION OF JANICE H. LEE

2/9/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER FOR THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF INCARCERATED DEFENDANT ANDY PLATON PER CC.P. ? 1995 - 1997; DECLARATION OF JANICE H. LEE

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER FOR THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF INCARCERATED DEFENDANT / CROSS-DEFENDANT ANDY PLATON

3/3/2017: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER FOR THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF INCARCERATED DEFENDANT / CROSS-DEFENDANT ANDY PLATON

Minute Order -

3/10/2017: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

9/5/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

9/5/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Discharged) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (REGARDING DISMISSAL OF THE CROSSCOMPLAINT;C/F 01/09/18) - Discharged

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (W/OUT PREJUDICE; CROSS COMPLAINT OF POTRERO, INC. dba EL POTRERO CLUB; SHYR-JIN TSAY and PATATA INVESTMENT, LLC FILED 11/16/16; ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by EL POTRERO CLUB (Defendant); SHYR-JIN TSAY (Defendant); PATATA INVESTMENT LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (FSC= 03/05/18; TD= 03/19/18OSC REGARDING ENTRY OF DEFAULT ASTO CROSS DEFENDANTS TACTICALSECURITY FIRM; 10-4 PATROLSERVICES; HECTOR BERRELLEZ AND M;CHRIS BERRELLEZ; C/F 08/31/17) - No appearance(s), off calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CARLOS ALBERTO INZUNZA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PERSONAL SERVICE 9/18/16 ANDY PLATON ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CARLOS ALBERTO INZUNZA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by CARLOS ALBERTO INZUNZA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued (GENERAL NEGLIGENCE, PI, PREMISE LIABILITY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EL POTRERO CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases where 10-4 PATROL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where POTRERO CLUB EL is a litigant

Latest cases where POTRERO INC is a litigant